Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2774329 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2774329



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(55)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 843
07.07.2020 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
01.07.2019 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
23.05.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.05.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
13.05.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
13.05.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
25.04.2019 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
28.02.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
28.02.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
28.02.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
28.02.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 64
28.02.2019 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 65
28.01.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
11.01.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
19.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.12.2018 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 10
19.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.12.2018 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
28.11.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.11.2018 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
22.11.2018 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
12.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
12.11.2018 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 6
12.11.2018 Authorisation Search / examination 1
12.11.2018 Authorisation Search / examination 2
12.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.11.2018 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 1
02.02.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
02.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
02.02.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 7
07.08.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
21.07.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.07.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
21.07.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
10.07.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
11.12.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
11.12.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 10
11.12.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
13.08.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.07.2014 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 3
23.07.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
11.06.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
06.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.05.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
30.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.04.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
14.03.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
30.05.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 102
30.05.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 355
30.05.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 54
10.05.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
10.05.2013 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 66