|
07.11.2019 |
Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2019 |
Withdrawal of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.11.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.06.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.01.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.08.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2014 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.05.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.05.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.12.2013 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.10.2013 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
11.07.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
11.07.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
11.07.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
36 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
6 |