Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
05.03.2016 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
18.01.2016 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.05.2015 | Change - classification | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
01.05.2015 | Change - date of supplementary search report | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
29.01.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.01.2015 | Change - extension states | published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
24.01.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
24.01.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
20.12.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.12.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.11.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.11.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.06.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.05.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication |