EP2701456 - WIRELESS BROADBAND DATA CARD SUPPORTING ACCESSING NETWORK IN 3G AND WI-FI MANNERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Wentao c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
LI, Xingyuan c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Chuanhui c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2014/09] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 12848964.8 | 18.01.2012 | WO2012CN70516 | Priority number, date | CN20111367672 | 18.11.2011 Original published format: CN201110367672 | [2014/09] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013071709 | Date: | 23.05.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2701456 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/06 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
H04W4/18 (EP,US);
H04W12/068 (EP,US);
H04W88/16 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE BREITBAND-DATENKARTE ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DES ZUGRIFFS AUF EIN NETZWERK IM 3G- UND WIFI-MODUS | [2014/09] | English: | WIRELESS BROADBAND DATA CARD SUPPORTING ACCESSING NETWORK IN 3G AND WI-FI MANNERS | [2014/09] | French: | CARTE DE DONNÉES LARGE BANDE SANS FIL SUPPORTANT L'ACCÈS RÉSEAU EN MODES 3G ET WI-FI | [2014/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2013 | Translation filed | 22.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 08.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 19.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010316021 (LERZER JUERGEN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0055]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0089]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0114]; figure 10 *; | [Y]US2007173283 (LIVET CATHERINE M [CA], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0101]; figures 6-10 *; | [A]US2009292842 (FOTHERGILL-ZITTRER NICHOLAS DAVID [CA]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016]; figures 1-4 * | International search | [A]CN101436988 (SHENZHEN HUAWEI COMM TECH CO [CN]); | [A]CN101741573 (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN101980577 (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN202026475U (XI AN FEILONG SOFTWARE CO LTD) |