EP2781756 - ROTARY COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2014/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGATA, Takeshi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
SHIOTANI, Yu c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
HIKICHI, Takumi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
SHII, Kentaro c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
SHOYAMA, Tadayoshi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
WADA, Masanobu c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 07 /
HASEGAWA, Hiroshi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 08 /
YOSHIDA, Hirofumi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 09 /
NAKAI, Hiroaki c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 10 /
HIWATA, Akira c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 11 /
FUNAKOSI, Daisuke c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 12 /
OHNO, Ryuichi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 13 /
KARINO, Tsuyoshi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2019/46] |
Former [2019/20] | 01 /
OGATA, Takeshi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIOTANI, Yu c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
03 /
HIKICHI, Takumi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
04 /
SHII, Kentaro c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
05 /
SHOYAMA, Tadayoshi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
06 /
WADA, Masanobu c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
07 /
HASEGAWA, Hiroshi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
08 /
YOSHIDA, Hirofumi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
09 /
NAKAI, Hiroaki c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
10 /
HIWATA, Akira c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
11 /
FUNAKOSI, Daisuke c/o Intellectual Property Center, Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
12 /
OHNO, Ryuichi c/o Intellectual Property Center, Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
13 /
KARINO, Tsuyoshi c/o Intellectual Property Center, Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
Former [2014/39] | 01 /
OGATA, Takeshi c/o Intellectual Property Center, Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIOTANI, Yu c/o Intellectual Property Center, Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
03 /
HIKICHI, Takumi c/o Intellectual Property Center, Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
04 /
SHII, Kentaro c/o Intellectual Property Center, Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
05 /
SHOYAMA, Tadayoshi c/o Intellectual Property Center, Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
06 /
WADA, Masanobu c/o Intellectual Property Center, Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
07 /
HASEGAWA, Hiroshi c/o Intellectual Property Center, Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
08 /
YOSHIDA, Hirofumi c/o Intellectual Property Center, Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
09 /
NAKAI, Hiroaki c/o Intellectual Property Center, Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
10 /
HIWATA, Akira c/o Intellectual Property Center, Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
11 /
FUNAKOSI, Daisuke c/o Intellectual Property Center, Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
12 /
OHNO, Ryuichi c/o Intellectual Property Center, Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
13 /
KARINO, Tsuyoshi c/o Intellectual Property Center, Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2014/39] | Application number, filing date | 12849471.3 | 14.11.2012 | [2019/46] | WO2012JP07302 | Priority number, date | JP20110250262 | 16.11.2011 Original published format: JP 2011250262 | JP20120177877 | 10.08.2012 Original published format: JP 2012177877 | [2014/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013073183 | Date: | 23.05.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2781756 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2781756 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F04C29/04, F04C18/356, F04C23/00, F04C29/00 | [2014/39] | CPC: |
F04C29/04 (EP,US);
F01C21/10 (EP,US);
F04C18/356 (EP,US);
F04C29/028 (US);
F04C29/126 (EP,US);
F04C2240/50 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTATIONSVERDICHTER | [2014/39] | English: | ROTARY COMPRESSOR | [2014/39] | French: | COMPRESSEUR ROTATIF | [2014/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2014 | Translation filed | 16.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 04.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2018 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.11.2012 | AL | 13.11.2019 | AT | 13.11.2019 | CY | 13.11.2019 | CZ | 13.11.2019 | DK | 13.11.2019 | EE | 13.11.2019 | ES | 13.11.2019 | FI | 13.11.2019 | HR | 13.11.2019 | IT | 13.11.2019 | LT | 13.11.2019 | LV | 13.11.2019 | MC | 13.11.2019 | MK | 13.11.2019 | MT | 13.11.2019 | NL | 13.11.2019 | PL | 13.11.2019 | RO | 13.11.2019 | RS | 13.11.2019 | SE | 13.11.2019 | SI | 13.11.2019 | SK | 13.11.2019 | SM | 13.11.2019 | TR | 13.11.2019 | IE | 14.11.2019 | LU | 14.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | FR | 13.01.2020 | BG | 13.02.2020 | GB | 13.02.2020 | NO | 13.02.2020 | GR | 14.02.2020 | IS | 13.03.2020 | PT | 13.03.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/26] | HU | 14.11.2012 | |
AL | 13.11.2019 | ||
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CY | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
MT | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
TR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 13.01.2020 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GB | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 14.11.2012 | |
AL | 13.11.2019 | ||
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CY | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
MT | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 13.01.2020 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GB | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 14.11.2012 | |
AL | 13.11.2019 | ||
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CY | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 13.01.2020 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GB | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CY | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 13.01.2020 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GB | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 13.01.2020 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GB | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 13.01.2020 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 13.01.2020 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
LU | 14.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | ES | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 13.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1967737 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-5,9,10,13 * paragraph [0023]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP2034131 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-5,9,10,13* paragraph [0008]; figure 1 * | International search | [A]JPS64387 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2007309146 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]JP2009002299 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [AP]JP2012122452 (DAIKIN IND LTD) | by applicant | JPH02140486 |