EP2782405 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING UPLINK TRANSMISSION POWER IN A MULTIPLE ELEMENT CARRIER WAVE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GoldPeak Innovations Inc. Suite 806, Digital-ro 34-gil 55, Guro-gu Seoul / KR | [2017/34] |
Former [2017/15] | For all designated states Pantech Inc. Pantech Bldg. 179 Seongam-Ro Mapo-gu Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2014/39] | For all designated states Pantech Co., Ltd Pantech R&D Center I-2, DMC Sangam-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-270 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWON, Ki Bum Pantech Bldg. I-2 DMC Sangam-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-070 / KR | 02 /
AHN, Jae Hyun Pantech Bldg. I-2 DMC Sangam-dong Mapo-gu Mapo-gu Seoul 121-070 / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Myung Cheul Pantech Bldg. I-2 DMC Sangam-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-070 / KR | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80 81679 München / DE | [2018/34] |
Former [2014/39] | Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12850075.8 | 02.11.2012 | [2018/34] | WO2012KR09177 | Priority number, date | KR20110119154 | 15.11.2011 Original published format: KR 20110119154 | [2014/39] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013073787 | Date: | 23.05.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2782405 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2782405 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/18, H04J11/00, H04B7/26, H04W72/04, H04W52/14, H04W52/36, H04W52/34, H04W52/28 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
H04W52/146 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (KR);
H04W52/281 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/325 (KR);
H04W52/34 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/365 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/40 (EP,US);
H04W52/50 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/1268 (US);
H04W72/21 (KR);
H04W74/0833 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/39] | H04W52/18, H04J11/00, H04B7/26, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER UPLINK-ÜBERTRAGUNGSLEISTUNG IN EINEM TRÄGERWELLENSYSTEM MIT MEHREREN ELEMENTEN | [2014/39] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING UPLINK TRANSMISSION POWER IN A MULTIPLE ELEMENT CARRIER WAVE SYSTEM | [2014/39] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE D'ÉMISSION DE LIAISON MONTANTE DANS SYSTÈME À MULTIPLES ONDES PORTEUSES ÉLÉMENTAIRES | [2014/39] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2014 | Translation filed | 04.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 22.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.2017 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 17.03.2016 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2016/47] | 01.03.2017 | Resumption of proceedings | [2017/06] | 17.03.2016 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2017/06] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.11.2012 | AL | 22.08.2018 | AT | 22.08.2018 | CY | 22.08.2018 | CZ | 22.08.2018 | DK | 22.08.2018 | EE | 22.08.2018 | ES | 22.08.2018 | FI | 22.08.2018 | HR | 22.08.2018 | IT | 22.08.2018 | LT | 22.08.2018 | LV | 22.08.2018 | MC | 22.08.2018 | MK | 22.08.2018 | NL | 22.08.2018 | PL | 22.08.2018 | PT | 22.08.2018 | RO | 22.08.2018 | RS | 22.08.2018 | SE | 22.08.2018 | SI | 22.08.2018 | SK | 22.08.2018 | SM | 22.08.2018 | TR | 22.08.2018 | IE | 02.11.2018 | LU | 02.11.2018 | MT | 02.11.2018 | BG | 22.11.2018 | NO | 22.11.2018 | GR | 23.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | IS | 22.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 02.11.2012 | |
AL | 22.08.2018 | ||
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PT | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 02.11.2018 | ||
MT | 02.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PT | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 02.11.2018 | ||
MT | 02.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 02.11.2018 | ||
MT | 02.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 02.11.2018 | ||
MT | 02.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 02.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 02.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 02.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 02.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 02.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 22.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2010121708 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al); | [XY]WO2011120716 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al); | International search | [A]US2009176525 (WANG JIN [US], et al); | [A]US2010238825 (ZHANG DANLU [US], et al); | [A]EP2326134 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US]) |