EP2781805 - DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AUTOMATIC TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JATCO Ltd 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | [2015/15] |
Former [2014/39] | For all designated states Jatco Ltd 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENDO, Go c/o JATCO Ltd 700-1 Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Kunihiro c/o JATCO Ltd 700-1 Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12850323.2 | 23.10.2012 | WO2012JP77278 | Priority number, date | JP20110253029 | 18.11.2011 Original published format: JP 2011253029 | [2014/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013073342 | Date: | 23.05.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2781805 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02, F16H61/684, F16H61/16, F16H61/06 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
F16H61/061 (EP,CN,US);
F16H61/0204 (US);
F16H61/16 (EP,CN,US);
F16H2059/006 (EP,CN,US);
F16H2306/24 (EP,CN,US);
F16H61/684 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/39] | F16H61/18, F16H61/02, F16H61/684 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/39] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINES AUTOMATIKGETRIEBES | [2014/39] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AUTOMATIC TRANSMISSION | [2014/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONTRÔLE D'UNE TRANSMISSION AUTOMATIQUE | [2014/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2014 | Translation filed | 16.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 16.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 03.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6148682 (POPP CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, lines 31-35 * * column 4, line 18 - column 5, line 43 *; | [A]US6692408 (SATO OSAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 1, lines 47-56 * * column 2, lines 6-23 * * column 5, line 34 - column 6, line 41; claim 2 *; | [Y]US2006040786 (POPP CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0011] , [0012] , [0046] *; | [A]DE102009045507 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0010] , [0011] , [0014] ** claims 1,2 * | International search | [A]JPH06346959 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JPH10220574 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [Y]JP2003097689 (JATCO LTD) | by applicant | JPH06346959 |