EP2781574 - LUMINESCENT COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE BASED THEREON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Obschestvo s Ogranichennoi Otvetstvennostyu "Lumen", (OOO "Lumen) ul. 1-ya Promyshlennaya, 19, of. 1 Saransk 430034 / RU | [2014/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAKSHTEYN, Maksim Sergeevich pr. Bogolyubova 30-214 Dubna Moskovskaya obl. 141980 / RU | 02 /
DEZHUROV, Sergey Valeryevich ul. Kirova 102-56 Kurgan 640001 / RU | 03 /
NAZARKIN, Arseniy Vladimirovich ul. Uritskogo 49 Dubna Moskovskaya obl. 141983 / RU | 04 /
TRUKHAN, Vladimir Mikhailovich Shkolnyj b-r 20-82 Chernogolovka Moskovskaya obl. 142432 / RU | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | Sloboshanin, Sergej, et al V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 3 81541 München / DE | [2016/46] |
Former [2014/39] | Sloboshanin, Sergej, et al von Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 3 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12850642.5 | 06.02.2012 | [2016/46] | WO2012RU00065 | Priority number, date | RU20110146673 | 18.11.2011 Original published format: RU 2011146673 | [2014/39] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013073986 | Date: | 23.05.2013 | Language: | RU | [2013/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2781574 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2781574 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 23.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/80, H01L33/26, B82Y30/00, B32B7/02, B82B1/00, B82Y40/00, B82Y20/00, B32B27/30, H01L33/50, C09K11/02 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
C09K11/7774 (EP,US);
B32B7/023 (EP,US);
B32B27/30 (EP);
C09K11/025 (EP);
B32B2307/422 (EP);
B82Y20/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2014/39] | C09K11/08, H01L33/26, B82Y30/00, B32B7/02, B82B1/00, B82Y40/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUMINESZIERENDES VERBUNDMATERIAL UND DARAUF BASIERENDE LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2014/39] | English: | LUMINESCENT COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE BASED THEREON | [2014/39] | French: | MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE LUMINESCENT ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE LE COMPRENANT | [2014/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2014 | Translation filed | 16.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 03.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.02.2012 | AL | 16.11.2016 | AT | 16.11.2016 | BE | 16.11.2016 | CY | 16.11.2016 | CZ | 16.11.2016 | DK | 16.11.2016 | EE | 16.11.2016 | ES | 16.11.2016 | FI | 16.11.2016 | HR | 16.11.2016 | IT | 16.11.2016 | LT | 16.11.2016 | LV | 16.11.2016 | MC | 16.11.2016 | MK | 16.11.2016 | NL | 16.11.2016 | PL | 16.11.2016 | RO | 16.11.2016 | RS | 16.11.2016 | SE | 16.11.2016 | SI | 16.11.2016 | SK | 16.11.2016 | SM | 16.11.2016 | TR | 16.11.2016 | LU | 06.02.2017 | MT | 06.02.2017 | BG | 16.02.2017 | NO | 16.02.2017 | GR | 17.02.2017 | IS | 16.03.2017 | PT | 16.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 06.02.2012 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
TR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
MT | 06.02.2017 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 06.02.2012 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
MT | 06.02.2017 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 06.02.2012 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
MT | 06.02.2017 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.02.2012 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
MT | 06.02.2017 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
MT | 06.02.2017 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 16.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03084292 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-86 *; | [A]US2005051777 (HILL STEVEN E [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0078] - [0124] *; | [A]US2005142371 (SWAIN STUART D [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-20 *; | [A]US2010123155 (PICKETT NIGEL [GB], et al) [A] 1-15* claims 1-30 * | International search | [Y]WO2007009010 (EVIDENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2010264371 (NICK ROBERT J [US]); | [Y]RU2416841 (OOO NP TS OPTIKO EHLEKTRONNYKH PRIBOROV OPTEHL OOO NPTS OEHP OPTEHL [RU]); | [Y]US2011090670 (AHN YOUNG JOO [KR], et al) | by applicant | WO2007009010 | RU2416841 | US2011090670 | US2011187262 |