EP2782993 - METHOD OF IN VITRO FERTILIZATION WITH DELAY OF EMBRYO TRANSFER AND USE OF PERIPHERAL BLOOD MONONUCLEAR CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2017 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mezadata Medical IP Holding LLP 111 Buck Road Unit 550 Suite 1 Huntington Valley, Pennsylvania 19006 / US | [2014/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FESKOV, Alexander 15 Yelizarova Street Kharkov 61002 / UA | 02 /
FESKOVA, Irina 15 Yelizarova Street Kharkov 61002 / UA | 03 /
ZHYLKOVA, Ievgeniia 20 Frunze Street Unit 8 Kharkov 61002 / UA | 04 /
ZHILKOV, Stanislav 301 Byberry Road Unit D15 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19116 / US | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Hally, Anna-Louise FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 12851029.4 | 21.11.2012 | WO2012US66258 | Priority number, date | US201161629651P | 23.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161629651 P | US201213655257 | 18.10.2012 Original published format: US201213655257 | [2014/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013078312 | Date: | 30.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2782993 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/078, A61D19/04, A61K35/14, A61B17/435 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
A61D19/04 (EP,IL,US);
A61B17/435 (IL,US);
A61D19/00 (EP,IL,US);
A61K35/14 (EP,IL,US);
A61K39/461 (EP,IL);
A61K39/46431 (EP,IL);
A61P13/00 (EP,IL);
A61P15/00 (EP,IL);
C12N5/0634 (EP,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/40] | C12N5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Extension states | BA | 23.06.2014 | ME | 23.06.2014 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IN-VITRO-FERTILISATION MIT VERZÖGERUNG VON EMBRYONENTRANSFER UND VERWENDUNG VON PERIPHEREN MONONUKLEAREN BLUTZELLEN | [2014/40] | English: | METHOD OF IN VITRO FERTILIZATION WITH DELAY OF EMBRYO TRANSFER AND USE OF PERIPHERAL BLOOD MONONUCLEAR CELLS | [2014/40] | French: | METHODE DE FECONDATION IN VITRO AVEC DELAI DU TRANSFERT D'EMBRYON ET UTILISATION DE CELLULES MONONUCLEAIRES DU SANG PERIFERIQUE | [2014/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 16.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.02.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 25.02.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.03.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.08.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 06.08.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.08.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.05.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 24.05.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.06.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.03.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 17.03.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.03.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.05.2016 | 30.11.2017 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.2018 | 30.11.2018 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005118563 (SHER GEOFFREY [US], et al) [A] 1-15* claims 1-55 *; | [I] - S. YOSHIOKA ET AL, "Intrauterine administration of autologous peripheral blood mononuclear cells promotes implantation rates in patients with repeated failure of IVF-embryo transfer", HUMAN REPRODUCTION, (20061201), vol. 21, no. 12, doi:10.1093/humrep/del312, ISSN 0268-1161, pages 3290 - 3294, XP055070108 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * Preparation and intauterine administration of PBMC; page 3291 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/humrep/del312 | [I] - OSAMU OKITSU ET AL, "Intrauterine administration of autologous peripheral blood mononuclear cells increases clinical pregnancy rates in frozen/thawed embryo transfer cycles of patients with repeated implantation failure", JOURNAL OF REPRODUCTIVE IMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE IRELAND LTD, IE, vol. 92, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JRI.2011.07.001, ISSN 0165-0378, (20110729), pages 82 - 87, (20110824), XP028119151 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph 2.4; page 84 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jri.2011.07.001 | [I] - IDETA A ET AL, "Administration of peripheral blood mononuclear cells into the uterine horn to improve pregnancy rate following bovine embryo transfer", ANIMAL REPRODUCTION SCIENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 117, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.ANIREPROSCI.2009.04.004, ISSN 0378-4320, (20100101), pages 18 - 23, (20090503), XP026745918 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph 2.3; page 19 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.anireprosci.2009.04.004 | [I] - H. FUJIWARA, "Do circulating blood cells contribute to maternal tissue remodeling and embryo-maternal cross-talk around the implantation period?", MOLECULAR HUMAN REPRODUCTION, (20090403), vol. 15, no. 6, doi:10.1093/molehr/gap027, ISSN 1360-9947, pages 335 - 343, XP055172772 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 338, column left * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/molehr/gap027 | [I] - L Janský ET AL, "Dynamics of cytokine production in human peripheral blood mononuclear cells stimulated by LPS or infected by Borrelia", Physiological research / Academia Scientiarum Bohemoslovaca, Czech Republic, (20030101), pages 593 - 598, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/14535835, (20150302), XP055135489 [I] 1-4,6 * Methods; page 594 * | [I] - KEISUKE SATO ET AL, "Impact of culture medium on the expansion of T cells for immunotherapy", CYTOTHERAPY, (20090101), vol. 11, no. 7, doi:10.3109/14653240903219114, ISSN 1465-3249, pages 936 - 946, XP055172784 [I] 1-4,6 * abstract * * page 917 * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/14653240903219114 | International search | [Y]US2005118563 (SHER GEOFFREY [US], et al); | [A]US2006015961 (TILLY JONATHAN L [US], et al); | [X] - YOSHIOKA ET AL., "Intrauterine administration of autologous peripheral blood mononuclear cells promotes implantation rates in patients with repeated failure of IVF-embryo transfer.", HUMAN REPRODUCTION, vol. 21, no. 12, pages 3290 - 3294, XP055070108 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/humrep/del312 | by applicant | US4315908 | US4725579 | US5418159 | WO9905255 | US6605468 | US6838235 | EP1581637 | WO2005121322 | EP1765987 | US7781207 | US7795018 | US7819796 | US8163508 | US8183214 | - YOSHIOKA et al., Human Reproduction, (20061200), vol. 21, no. 12, pages 3290 - 3294 | - OKITSU et al., Journal of Reproductive Immunology, (20110000), vol. 92, no. 1, pages 82 - 87 | - IDETA et al., Animal Reproduction Science, (20100102), vol. 117, pages 18 - 23 | - FUJIWARA, Molecular Human Reproduction, (20090400), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 335 - 343 | WO1998US15124 | US20040777149 | US20040829081 | US20100587406 |