Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9775305 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2017 | B2 | US2016219800 | 04.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314002714 | 13.09.2013 | US201615011359 | 29.01.2016 | WO2012KR08642 | 22.10.2012 | KR20110121491 | 21.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014055876 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012KR08642 | 22.10.2012 | KR20110121491 | 21.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5792896B | Global Dossier | 14.10.2015 | B2 | JP2014523358 | 11.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012KR08642 | 22.10.2012 | KR20110121491 | 21.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2784560 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2017 | B1 | EP2784560 | 25.11.2015 | A4 | EP2784560 | 01.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012KR08642 | 22.10.2012 | KR20110121491 | 21.11.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013077557 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20110121491 | 21.11.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101141734B | Global Dossier | 03.05.2012 | B1 | Priority number | Date | KR20110121491 | 21.11.2011 |