EP2784033 - OPTICAL FIBER PREFORM, METHOD FOR PRODUCING OPTICAL FIBER, AND OPTICAL FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2014/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMURA, Yoshiaki c/o Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1 Taya-cho Sakae-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-8588 / JP | 02 /
HARUNA, Tetsuya c/o Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1 Taya-cho Sakae-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-8588 / JP | 03 /
HIRANO, Masaaki c/o Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1 Taya-cho Sakae-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-8588 / JP | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/52] |
Former [2014/40] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12851113.6 | 16.11.2012 | [2016/52] | WO2012JP79769 | Priority number, date | JP20110253913 | 21.11.2011 Original published format: JP 2011253913 | [2014/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013077263 | Date: | 30.05.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2784033 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2784033 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/018, C03B20/00, C03C13/04, G02B6/02, G02B6/036 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
C03B37/01807 (EP,US);
G02B6/03622 (US);
C03B37/01413 (US);
C03B37/018 (US);
C03B37/01815 (US);
C03B37/027 (US);
C03C13/04 (US);
C03C13/045 (EP,US);
C03C13/046 (US);
G02B6/036 (US);
G02B6/03627 (EP,US);
G02B6/03694 (EP,US);
C03B2201/04 (US);
C03B2201/07 (EP,US);
C03B2201/075 (EP,US);
C03B2201/12 (EP,US);
C03B2201/20 (EP,US);
C03B2201/23 (EP,US);
C03B2201/50 (EP,US);
C03B2203/22 (EP,US);
C03B2203/23 (EP,US);
C03B2203/34 (US);
C03B2203/36 (EP,US);
C03C2201/23 (EP,US);
C03C2201/50 (EP,US);
C03C2203/44 (EP,US);
C03C2203/46 (EP,US);
G02B6/02019 (EP,US);
G02B6/02242 (EP,US);
G02B6/02266 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/40] | C03B37/018, C03B20/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLASFASER-VORFORM, VERFAHREN ZUR GLASFASERHERSTELLUNG UND GLASFASER | [2014/40] | English: | OPTICAL FIBER PREFORM, METHOD FOR PRODUCING OPTICAL FIBER, AND OPTICAL FIBER | [2014/40] | French: | PRÉFORME DE FIBRE OPTIQUE, PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE UNE FIBRE OPTIQUE ET FIBRE OPTIQUE | [2014/40] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2013 | Translation filed | 04.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 02.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2012 | AL | 28.12.2016 | AT | 28.12.2016 | BE | 28.12.2016 | CY | 28.12.2016 | CZ | 28.12.2016 | EE | 28.12.2016 | ES | 28.12.2016 | FI | 28.12.2016 | HR | 28.12.2016 | IT | 28.12.2016 | LT | 28.12.2016 | LV | 28.12.2016 | MC | 28.12.2016 | MK | 28.12.2016 | PL | 28.12.2016 | RO | 28.12.2016 | RS | 28.12.2016 | SE | 28.12.2016 | SI | 28.12.2016 | SK | 28.12.2016 | SM | 28.12.2016 | TR | 28.12.2016 | BG | 28.03.2017 | NO | 28.03.2017 | GR | 29.03.2017 | IS | 28.04.2017 | PT | 28.04.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 16.11.2012 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
TR | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 16.11.2012 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 16.11.2012 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.11.2012 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 28.12.2016 | |
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 28.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2004020357 (CORNING INC [US]) [AD] 1-13 * example 1; claims 1,4,5,21-24 *; | [AD]US2005063663 (ANDERSON JAMES G [US], et al) [AD] 1-13 * paragraphs [0006] - [0010] - [0016]; figures 2,11; claims 1-6; tables 3,5,6 *; | [A]US7088900 (MISHRA SNIGDHARAJ KUMAR [US]) [A] 1,10,11 * figures 5,12-14; claims 1,15,16 *; | [A]US2007297735 (KHRAPKO ROSTISLAV RADIEVICH [US], et al) [A] 1,10,11* paragraphs [0042] , [0044]; figures 1-3; claims 1,13,14 *; | [A]US2008050086 (BICKHAM SCOTT ROBERTSON [US], et al) [A] 1,10,11 * column 48; claims 1,12,13,19 *; | [A]US2008279515 (BICKHAM SCOTT ROBERTSON [US], et al) [A] 1,10,11 * paragraph [0057]; figure 1; claims 1-7 * | International search | [A]GB1598760 (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003054995 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JP2005537210 (CORNING INC.); | [Y]JP2007504080 (CORNING INC.) | by applicant | US5146534 | WO9802389 | JP2005537210 | US2006130530 | JP2007504080 | JP2008536190 | JP2009541796 | JP2010501894 | JP2010526749 |