EP2783005 - RECOMBINANT SEROTYPE 5 (AC]5) ADENOVIRAL VECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Targovax Oy Saukonpaadenranta 2 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2016/30] |
Former [2014/40] | For all designated states Oncos Therapeutics Ltd. Saukonpaadenranta 2 00180 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANKI, Tuuli Urpukuja 1 FI-11130 Riihimäki / FI | 02 /
HEMMINKI, Akseli Pohjoinen Hesperiankatu 37 A 22 FI-00260 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
CERULLO, Vincenzo Uimarinpolku 10 C 15 FI-00330 Helsinki / FI | 04 /
KOSKI, Anniina Leppävaarankatu 19 B 29 FI-02600 Espoo / FI | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Boco IP Oy Ab Kansakoulukatu 3 00100 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Boco IP Oy Ab Itämerenkatu 5 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 12852023.6 | 23.11.2012 | WO2012FI51162 | Priority number, date | FI20110006181 | 25.11.2011 Original published format: FI 20116181 | US201161563634P | 25.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161563634 P | [2014/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013076374 | Date: | 30.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2783005 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 30.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/861, A61K35/76, A61K48/00, C12N5/10, A61P35/00, A61K35/761, C12N15/86 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
A61K35/761 (EP,FI,US);
C12N15/8616 (FI);
C12N7/00 (US);
A61K39/235 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K48/005 (FI);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C12N5/10 (FI);
C12N2710/10021 (US);
C12N2710/10032 (US);
C12N2710/10034 (US);
|
Former IPC [2014/40] | C12N15/861, A61K35/76, A61K48/00, C12N5/10, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTE SEROTYP-5-(AC]5)-ADENOVIRUSVEKTOREN | [2014/40] | English: | RECOMBINANT SEROTYPE 5 (AC]5) ADENOVIRAL VECTORS | [2014/40] | French: | NOUVEAUX VECTEURS THÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2014/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 08.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/39] | 19.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/39] | Divisional application(s) | EP15186798.3 / EP3006566 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003138405 (FUEYO JUAN [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * [0037], [0095], [0096], [0105]- [0107], [0109], [0112]- [115], [0238], Examples 9, 10, 12, 13, claims 1,2 ,7, 28-32, 40, 41, 48 and Figure 2 *; | [IA] - LEI N ET AL, "An oncolytic adenovirus expressing granulocyte macrophage colony-stimulating factor shows improved specificity and efficacy for treating human solid tumors", CANCER GENE THERAPY,, (20080801), vol. 16, no. 1, doi:10.1038/CGT.2008.46, pages 33 - 43, XP002571569 [I] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cgt.2008.46 | [A] - M. IACOBELLI-MARTINEZ ET AL, "Preferential Activation of Toll-Like Receptor Nine by CD46-Utilizing Adenoviruses", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (20061115), vol. 81, no. 3, doi:10.1128/JVI.01926-06, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 1305 - 1312, XP055194212 [A] 1-22 * Page 1310 of the Discussion. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.01926-06 | [A] - HAN HSI WONG ET AL, "Oncolytic Viruses for Cancer Therapy: Overcoming the Obstacles", VIRUSES, (20100111), vol. 2, no. 1, doi:10.3390/v2010078, pages 78 - 106, XP055149118 [A] 1-22 * Results (pages 35-36) and Figure 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/v2010078 | International search | [A]WO2010072900 (ONCOS THERAPEUTICS [FI], et al); | [A]EP1990418 (DNATRIX INC [US]); | [A]WO2009127666 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE BIOLOG SA [BE], et al); | [A]US2011053893 (WU TOM YAO HSIANG [US], et al) | by applicant | EP1377671 | US2003104625 | EP1767642 | WO2010072900 | - BERK, ANNU REV GENET, (1986), vol. 20, pages 45 - 79 | - FUEYO ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2000), vol. 19, pages 2 - 12 | - HEISE ET AL., NAT MED, (2000), vol. 6, pages 1134 - 9 | - HANAHAN; WEINBERG, CELL, (2000), vol. 100, pages 57 - 70 | - SCHULZ ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 433, pages 887 - 92 | - MOEHLER ET AL., HUM GENE THER, (2005), vol. 16, pages 996 - 1005 | - PRESTWICH ET AL., EXPERT REV ANTICANCER, (2008), vol. 8, pages 1581 - 8 | - RUSSELL, J GEN VIROL, (2000), vol. 90, pages 1 - 20 | - NEMEROW ET AL., VIROLOGY, (2009), vol. 384, pages 380 - 8 | - RUSSELL W.C., J GENERAL VIROL, (2000), vol. 81, pages 2573 - 2604 | - MORAN, FASEB J, (1993), vol. 7, pages 880 - 5 | - RAWLE ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1989), vol. 143, pages 2031 - 7 | - WOLD, J CELL BIOCHEM, (1993), vol. 53, pages 329 - 35 | - DANTHINNE; IMPERIALE, GENE THER, (2000), vol. 7, pages 1707 - 14 | - JOHNSON; SCHNEIDER-BROUSSARD, FRONT BIOSCI, (1998), vol. 3, pages 447 - 8 | - RULEY, NATURE, (1983), vol. 304, pages 602 - 6 | - RAYCHAUDHURI ET AL., GENES DEV, (1991), vol. 5, pages 1200 - 11 | - FATTAEY ET AL., MOL CELL BIOL, (1993), vol. 13, pages 7267 - 77 | - CERULLO ET AL., MOL THER, (2007), vol. 15, pages 378 - 85 | - TUVE ET AL., VACCINE, (2009), vol. 27, pages 4225 - 39 | - MATZINGER, ANNU REV IMMUNOL, (1994), vol. 12, pages 991 - 1045 | - LATZ ET AL., NAT IMMUNOL, (2007), vol. 8, pages 772 - 779 | - WANG ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (2011), vol. 17, pages 96 - 105 | - BIEDERMANN ET AL., J PATHOL, (2005), vol. 207, pages 199 - 206 | - ABBOD ET AL., EXPERT REV ANTICANCER THER, (2009), vol. 9, pages 867 - 870 | - TROJAN ET AL., ANTICANCER RES, (2005), vol. 25, pages 183 - 191 | - HARADA ET AL., ACTA DERM VENEREOL, (1996), vol. 76, pages 417 - 420 | - SCHMITT ET AL., J INVEST DERMATOL, (2007), vol. 127, pages 2191 - 2206 | - WICKHAM ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 73, pages 309 - 19 | - BOROVJAGIN ET AL., CANCER GENE THER, (2005), vol. 12, pages 475 - 86 | - KRASNYKH ET AL., J VIROL, (1998), vol. 70, pages 6839 - 46 | - SMITH ET AL., HUM GENE THER, (2003), vol. 14, pages 777 - 87 | - SMITH ET AL., HUMAN GENE THER, (2003), vol. 14, pages 1595 - 1604 | - KANERVA ET AL., GENE THER, (2005), vol. 12, pages 87 - 94 | - CERULLO ET AL., CANCER RES, (2010), vol. 70, pages 4297 - 309 | - KANERVA ET AL., MOL THER, (2003), vol. 3, pages 449 - 58 | - NETTELBECK ET AL., CANCER RES, (2002), vol. 62, pages 4663 - 70 | - KOSKI ET AL., MOL THER, (2010), vol. 18, pages 1874 - 84 | - TAKAYAMA ET AL., J. MED. VIROL, (2007), vol. 79, pages 278 - 284 | - JAGER, INT J CANCER, (1999), vol. 84, pages 506 - 510 |