blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2787666

EP2787666 - WIRELESS RECEPTION DEVICE AND WIRELESS RECEPTION METHOD IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.06.2016
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.07.2016  [2016/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / FUTATSUGI, Yasunori
c/o NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)MacDougall, Alan John Shaw
Mathys & Squire The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]MacDougall, Alan John Shaw
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Application number, filing date12852594.608.11.2012
WO2012JP07161
Priority number, dateJP2011026130830.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011261308
[2014/41]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2013080451
Date:06.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787666
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.2015
ClassificationIPC:H04J11/00, H04B1/10, H04B7/005, H04W16/14, H04L25/02
[2015/32]
CPC:
H04J11/0023 (EP,US); H04B1/1027 (US); H04L25/0202 (US);
H04W16/14 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2014/41]H04J11/00, H04B1/10, H04B7/005
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSE EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG UND DRAHTLOSES EMPFANGSVERFAHREN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2014/41]
English:WIRELESS RECEPTION DEVICE AND WIRELESS RECEPTION METHOD IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2014/41]
French:DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION SANS FIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION SANS FIL DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase19.06.2014Translation filed 
19.06.2014National basic fee paid 
19.06.2014Search fee paid 
19.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
02.02.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/30]
08.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1903732  (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [Y] 4,9 * abstract *;
 [Y]US2010061495  (CHO CHUN-MING [TW], et al) [Y] 4,9 * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2010085890  (WI LAN INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0016]; figure 4 *;
 [XYI]WO2011126570  (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,10-12 * abstract * * page 3, line 25 - page 23, line 9 * [Y] 4,9 [I] 3,8
International search[A]WO2008090764  (NEC CORP [JP], et al);
 [A]JP2009081535  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, et al);
 [A]WO2010053019  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al);
 [A]  - JUN MASUNO ET AL., "Frequency Utilization Efficiency Improvement by Cyclic FEC Decoding in Superposed Multicarrier Transmission", IEICE TECHNICAL REPORT, (20081112), XP008147636
by applicantJP2009081535
    - W. PENG; F. ADACHI, "Frequency Domain Adaptive Antenna Array for Broadband Single-Carrier Uplink Transmission", IEICE TRANS. COMMUN., (201107), vol. E94-B, no. 7
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.