EP2787478 - METHOD FOR MAKING A PROFIT USING INDIVIDUAL SHOPS, AND SYSTEM AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kim, Jeung Ho 1816-902 38 Haemilyedang 3-ro Jinjeop-eup Namyangju-si, Gyeonggi-do 472-828 / KR | [2014/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/41] | Representative(s) | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [2014/41] | Application number, filing date | 12853560.6 | 03.07.2012 | WO2012KR05280 | Priority number, date | KR20110128583 | 02.12.2011 Original published format: KR 20110128583 | [2014/41] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013081267 | Date: | 06.06.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2787478 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0251 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES GEWINN MIT EINZELNEN LÄDEN SOWIE SYSTEM UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2014/41] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING A PROFIT USING INDIVIDUAL SHOPS, AND SYSTEM AND RECORDING MEDIUM | [2014/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR RÉALISER UN PROFIT À L'AIDE DE MAGASINS INDIVIDUELS, ET SYSTÈME ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2014/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2014 | Translation filed | 02.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 18.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.05.2017 | 04.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/41] | 08.06.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]KR20100012577 (3D MEDIA SOLUTIONS KOREA INC [KR]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0053]; figure 1 *; | [I]KR20100018466 (KT HITEL CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0031]; figure 1 *; | [I]KR20090117185 (BIZMODELINE CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0061]; figure 1 *; | [I]US2003220830 (MYR DAVID [IL]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [[0027]] - paragraph [[0032]] * * paragraph [[0050]] - paragraph [[0062]] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US7930204 (SHARMA RAJEEV [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]KR20090117185 (BIZMODELINE CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20050041496 (KO JUNG CHAN [KR]); | [Y]KR20100012577 (3D MEDIA SOLUTIONS KOREA INC [KR]); | [A]KR20020093444 (KARAMENG [KR]); | [A]KR20100018466 (KT HITEL CO LTD [KR]) | Examination | JP2010097154 | by applicant | KR20000054805 |