EP2786500 - WIRELESS DEVICES AND CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states No Strings Toys LLC 493 East Kaibab Place Chandler, AZ 85249 / US | [2014/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMOTO, Rodney, Kenji 493 East Kaibab Place Chandler, AZ 85249 / US | [2014/41] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Mark Peter J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2014/41] | Application number, filing date | 12853760.2 | 30.11.2012 | WO2012US67264 | Priority number, date | US201161566189P | 02.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161566189 P | [2014/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013082407 | Date: | 06.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2786500 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/38 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
H04L67/125 (EP,US);
H04B1/38 (US);
H04L67/34 (US);
H04L69/18 (EP,US);
H04W8/005 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (US);
H04L69/165 (EP,US);
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/41] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE VORRICHTUNGEN UND STEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/41] | English: | WIRELESS DEVICES AND CONTROL METHOD | [2014/41] | French: | DISPOSITIFS SANS FIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2014/41] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 07.09.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6141323 (RUSU MARINICA [US], et al); | [A]US2003085823 (LEE HOI-JIN [KR]); | [A]US7065050 (HERBST JOSEPH [US]); | [A]US2007008984 (PHILIPS NORBERT J L [BE], et al); | [X]US2007198128 (ZIEGLER ANDREW [US], et al); | [Y] - WANG ET AL., "Protocols and Applications of Ad-hoc Robot Wireless Communication Networks: An Overview", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF INTELLIGENT CONTROL AND SYSTEMS, vol. 10, no. 4, (200512), pages 296 - 303, URL: http://www.ezconf.net/UJICS/files/31/5-Wang-296-303.pdf, (20130113), XP055070724 |