EP2787094 - ALUMINUM ALLOY MATERIAL AND ALUMINUM ALLOY STRUCTURE AND PRODUCTION PROCESS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UACJ Corporation 1-7-2, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2014/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIIKURA Akio c/o UACJ Corporation 1-7-2, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0004 / JP | 02 /
FUJITA Kazuko c/o UACJ Corporation 1-7-2, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0004 / JP | 03 /
MURASE Takashi c/o UACJ Corporation 1-7-2, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0004 / JP | 04 /
OYA Yoshiyuki c/o UACJ Corporation 1-7-2, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0004 / JP | 05 /
KUROSAKI Tomohito c/o UACJ Corporation 1-7-2, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0004 / JP | [2014/41] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2016/49] |
Former [2014/41] | Baumgärtel, Gunnar Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 12853959.0 | 01.10.2012 | [2016/49] | WO2012JP75404 | Priority number, date | JP20110264845 | 02.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011264845 | [2014/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013080650 | Date: | 06.06.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2787094 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2787094 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F28F1/12, F28F1/02, F28F21/08 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
C22C21/02 (EP,US);
B23K20/14 (US);
B23K20/2333 (US);
B32B15/016 (EP,US);
B32B15/017 (EP,US);
C22C1/02 (EP,US);
C22C21/00 (US);
C22C21/04 (EP,US);
C22C21/10 (EP,US);
C22C21/14 (EP,US);
C22C21/18 (EP,US);
C22F1/043 (EP,US);
F28F1/126 (EP,US);
F28F21/084 (EP,US);
B23K2101/14 (EP,US);
B23K2103/10 (EP,US);
C22F1/00 (US);
C22F1/04 (US);
C22F1/057 (US);
F28F1/022 (EP,US);
F28F2215/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/50] | C22C21/02, B23K20/00, C22C21/00, C22C21/10, F28F21/08, C22F1/00, C22F1/04, C22F1/043, C22F1/057, F28F1/02 | ||
Former IPC [2014/41] | C22C21/02, B23K20/00, C22C21/00, C22C21/10, F28F21/08, C22F1/00, C22F1/04, C22F1/043, C22F1/057 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNGSMATERIAL UND ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNGSSTRUKTUR SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/41] | English: | ALUMINUM ALLOY MATERIAL AND ALUMINUM ALLOY STRUCTURE AND PRODUCTION PROCESS THEREFOR | [2014/41] | French: | MATÉRIAU EN ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM ET STRUCTURE EN ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2014/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2014 | Translation filed | 01.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 17.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.10.2012 | AL | 07.12.2016 | AT | 07.12.2016 | CY | 07.12.2016 | DK | 07.12.2016 | EE | 07.12.2016 | FI | 07.12.2016 | HR | 07.12.2016 | LT | 07.12.2016 | LV | 07.12.2016 | MC | 07.12.2016 | MK | 07.12.2016 | NL | 07.12.2016 | RS | 07.12.2016 | SI | 07.12.2016 | SK | 07.12.2016 | SM | 07.12.2016 | TR | 07.12.2016 | BG | 07.03.2017 | NO | 07.03.2017 | IS | 07.04.2017 | PT | 07.04.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 01.10.2012 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
TR | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 01.10.2012 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 01.10.2012 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.10.2012 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | EE | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | FI | 07.12.2016 | |
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 07.12.2016 | |
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 07.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1693475 (FURUKAWA SKY ALUMINUM CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009078398 (UEDA TOSHIKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [AD]JP2010168613 (FURUKAWA SKY ALUMINUM CORP) [AD] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011287277 (KIMURA SHIMPEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH036355 (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP); | [X]JP2001262264 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [X]JP2004332106 (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO); | [X]JP2009068056 (SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND); | [X]JP2010168613 (FURUKAWA SKY ALUMINUM CORP); | [XP]JP2012040611 (FURUKAWA SKY ALUMINUM CORP); | [XP]JP2012051028 (FURUKAWA SKY ALUMINUM CORP) | by applicant | JP2008303405 | JP2008308760 | JP2009161835 | JP2010168613 |