EP2789667 - MOISTURE-CURABLE HOT MELT ADHESIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2016 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2014/42] | For all designated states Henkel AG&Co. KGAA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMOGAMI, Tsuyoshi c/o Henkel Japan Ltd. 11-9 Semba-higashi 1-chome Minoo-shi Osaka 562-8586 / JP | [2014/42] | Application number, filing date | 12854658.7 | 04.12.2012 | [2017/06] | WO2012JP81389 | Priority number, date | JP20110265982 | 05.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011265982 | [2014/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013084891 | Date: | 13.06.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2789667 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2789667 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C09J175/04, B60R13/02, C09J133/04, C09J175/06, C08G18/42 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
C09J175/08 (EP,US);
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/4063 (EP,US);
C08G18/4211 (EP,US);
C08G18/44 (EP,US);
C08G18/6229 (EP,US);
C08G18/7642 (EP,US);
C08L33/066 (EP,US);
C08L33/08 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/307 (EP,US);
C09J175/08, C08L33/066 (US,EP);
C09J175/08, C08L33/08 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/42] | C09J175/04, B60R13/02, C09J133/04, C09J175/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEUCHTIGKEITSHÄRTBARER HEISSSCHMELZKLEBER | [2014/42] | English: | MOISTURE-CURABLE HOT MELT ADHESIVE | [2014/42] | French: | ADHÉSIF THERMOFUSIBLE DURCISSABLE À L'HUMIDITÉ | [2014/42] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2014 | Translation filed | 28.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 25.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 02.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2012 | AL | 08.02.2017 | AT | 08.02.2017 | CY | 08.02.2017 | DK | 08.02.2017 | EE | 08.02.2017 | FI | 08.02.2017 | HR | 08.02.2017 | LT | 08.02.2017 | LV | 08.02.2017 | MC | 08.02.2017 | MK | 08.02.2017 | NL | 08.02.2017 | PL | 08.02.2017 | RO | 08.02.2017 | RS | 08.02.2017 | SE | 08.02.2017 | SI | 08.02.2017 | SK | 08.02.2017 | SM | 08.02.2017 | TR | 08.02.2017 | BG | 08.05.2017 | NO | 08.05.2017 | GR | 09.05.2017 | IS | 08.06.2017 | PT | 08.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 04.12.2012 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
MK | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
TR | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 04.12.2012 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
MK | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 04.12.2012 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.12.2012 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006025555 (ICHIHASHI HIDEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0007] ** example 1 * | International search | [Y]JPH0517736 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [Y]JP2003193019 (KONISHI CO LTD); | [Y]WO2004031296 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2005023181 (UBE INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JP2010248278 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) |