EP2789332 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING DIAMINODIPHENYLSULFONE OR THE PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALTS THEREOF FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING DISEASES ASSOCIATED WITH DECREASE IN BONE MASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gachon University of Industry-Academic Cooperation Foundation 1342 Seongnam-daero Sujeong-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 461-701 / KR | [2014/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Sang Chul 369-16 Gungnae-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-470 / KR | 02 /
CHO, Sung Chun 702 Daelim A1 Apt. 104-22 Bupyeong-dong Bupyeong-gu Incheon 403-010 / KR | 03 /
SON, Young Hoon 171 Bulgwang 2-dong Eunpyeong-gu Seoul 122-853 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Seok Jin 202 129-36 Dongsung-dong Jongno-gu Seoul 110-809 / KR | 05 /
CHUNG, Sun Gun 15-164 Seongbuk-dong Seongbuk-gu Seoul 136-020 / KR | [2014/42] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 12854772.6 | 07.12.2012 | WO2012KR10648 | Priority number, date | KR20110130608 | 07.12.2011 Original published format: KR 20110130608 | [2014/42] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013085352 | Date: | 13.06.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2789332 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/136, A61P19/10, A61P43/00 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
A61K31/136 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/145 (US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A61K31/18 (KR);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/306 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/42] | A61K31/136, A61K31/18, A61P19/10, A61P19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/42] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT DIAMINODIPHENYLSULFON ODER PHARMAZEUTISCH AKZEPTABLEN SALZE ZUR PRÄVENTION ODER BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN IN ZUSAMMENHANG MIT DER ABNAHME DER KNOCHENMASSE | [2014/42] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING DIAMINODIPHENYLSULFONE OR THE PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALTS THEREOF FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING DISEASES ASSOCIATED WITH DECREASE IN BONE MASS | [2014/42] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE COMPRENANT UNE DIAMINODIPHÉNYLSULFONE OU SES SELS PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLES ET PERMETTANT DE PRÉVENIR OU DE TRAITER DES MALADIES ASSOCIÉES À UNE RÉDUCTION DE LA MASSE OSSEUSE | [2014/42] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2014 | Translation filed | 27.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 01.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/24] | 12.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - B BERLOW ET AL, "The effect of dapsone in steroid-dependent asthma", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, (19910301), vol. 87, no. 3, doi:10.1016/0091-6749(91)90393-3, ISSN 0091-6749, pages 710 - 715, XP055105107 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0091-6749(91)90393-3 | [A] - G BORMANN ET AL, "Dapsone in rosacea fulminans", JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN ACADEMY OF DERMATOLOGY AND VENEREOLOGY, (20010901), vol. 15, no. 5, doi:10.1046/j.1468-3083.2001.00325.x, ISSN 0926-9959, pages 465 - 467, XP055032411 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1468-3083.2001.00325.x | [T] - WOZEL GOTTFRIED ET AL, "Dapsone in dermatology and beyond", ARCHIVES OF DERMATOLOGICAL RESEARCH, SPRINGER, INTERNATIONAL, BERLIN, DE, vol. 306, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S00403-013-1409-7, ISSN 0340-3696, (20131206), pages 103 - 124, (20131206), XP035329209 [T] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00403-013-1409-7 | International search | [A]US6071543 (THORNFELDT CARL R [US]); | [A]US2005186156 (OSBORNE DAVID W [US]); | [A]US2007122435 (OSBORNE DAVID W [US]); | [A]US2008076829 (DALTON JAMES T [US], et al); | [A]KR20110049808 (SNU R&DB FOUNDATION [KR]) |