Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9350612 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2016 | B2 | US2014301183 | 09.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201110403134 | 07.12.2011 | WO2012CN85441 | 28.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2775675 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2016 | B1 | EP2775675 | 26.11.2014 | A4 | EP2775675 | 10.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201110403134 | 07.12.2011 | WO2012CN85441 | 28.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013083013 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201110403134 | 07.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103152266B | Global Dossier | 03.08.2016 | B | CN103152266 | 12.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201110403134 | 07.12.2011 |