EP2788869 - HYBRID VIRTUAL COMPUTING ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kubisys Inc. 1 Blue Hill Plaza Pearl River New York, New York 10965 / US | [2014/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANERJEE, Amit 350 Parsippany Road Apt 75 Parsippany New Jersey 07054 / US | 02 /
URANO, Shinichi 265 Madison Avenue River Edge New Jersey 07661 / US | 03 /
ACHARYA, Soubir 73 Sky Top Drive Pleasantville New York 10570 / US | [2014/42] | Representative(s) | Lucey, Michael PurdyLucey Intellectual Property Limited 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D02 FH73 Dublin 2 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | Lucey, Michael PurdyLucey Intellectual Property 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D2 Dublin / IE | Application number, filing date | 12856032.3 | 06.12.2012 | WO2012US68154 | Priority number, date | US201161568860P | 09.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161568860 P | [2014/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013086124 | Date: | 13.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2788869 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F11/36 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
H04L41/0813 (EP,US);
H04L41/084 (EP,US);
H04L67/1095 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/42] | G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/42] | Title | German: | HYBRIDE VIRTUELLE BERECHNUNGSUMGEBUNGEN | [2014/42] | English: | HYBRID VIRTUAL COMPUTING ENVIRONMENTS | [2014/42] | French: | ENVIRONNEMENTS INFORMATIQUES VIRTUELS HYBRIDES | [2014/42] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 05.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 30.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009106256 (SAFARI TIGRAN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-3; claims 1-46 * * page 1, paragraph 0008 - page 1, paragraph 0009 * * page 3, paragraph 0038 - page 4, paragraph 0048 * * page 6, paragraph 0071 - page 98, paragraph 0116 *; | [X]US2008270104 (STRATTON ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11-14 * abstract * * figures 1-11; claims 1-35 * * page 2, paragraph 0027 - page 3, paragraph 0033 * * page 3, paragraph 0043 - page 4, paragraph 0051 * * page 6, paragraph 0088 - page 6, paragraph 0094 * * page 7, paragraph 0101 - page 8, paragraph 0106 *; | [X]WO2009155574 (SERVICEMESH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * the whole document *; | [X]US2007180449 (CROFT RICHARD J [AU], et al) [X] 1,11,12 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 0016 - page 3, paragraph 0024 * * page 6, paragraph 0141 - page 9, paragraph 167 * * page 25, paragraph 0321 - page 39, paragraph 0448 * * figures 1-97; claims 1-68 * | International search | [X]US2007180449 (CROFT RICHARD J [AU], et al); | [A]US2010299205 (ERDMANN DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US2009193413 (LEE MOSO [US]); | [A]US2008165789 (ANSARI AMIR [US], et al); | [A]US2007074121 (MULLENDER MAARTEN W [US], et al); | [A]US2005283518 (SARGENT SCOTT R [US]) | by applicant | US2009106256 |