EP2790883 - APPARATUS, SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MODULAR CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marion Investments Ltd. 902-2246 Bellevue Avenue West Vancouver, British Columbia V7V 1C6 / CA | [2014/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RECHENMACHER, William, John 902-2246 Bellevue Avenue West Vancouver, British Columbia V7V 1C6 / CA | 02 /
YANG, Tsung, Yuan 4005 SW Marine Drive Vancouver, British Columbia V6N 4A5 / CA | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2014/43] | Application number, filing date | 12856691.6 | 14.12.2012 | WO2012CA50901 | Priority number, date | US201161570656P | 14.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161570656 P | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013086638 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2790883 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 20.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B28B7/22, B28B23/02, B28B23/18, E04B1/343, E04C3/02, E04C3/30, E04B1/348, E04B1/16, E04B2/86, E04G21/02, E04H1/00 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
E04B1/161 (EP,US);
E04G21/02 (US);
E04B1/165 (EP,US);
E04B1/3483 (EP,US);
E04B2/86 (EP,US);
E04H1/005 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/43] | B28B7/22, B28B23/02, B28B23/18, E04B1/343, E04C3/02, E04C3/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE MODULARE KONSTRUKTION | [2014/43] | English: | APPARATUS, SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MODULAR CONSTRUCTION | [2014/43] | French: | APPAREIL, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR CONSTRUCTION MODULAIRE | [2014/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 11.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 21.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/33] | 11.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2015615 (SANDERS & FORSTER LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-12 * page 1, line 88 - page 2, line 125; figures 1-5 *[I] 3,6,7,13-15; | [XI]GB2252986 (CHADWICK ARTHUR JOHN MACKENZIE, et al) [X] 1-5,8-13,15 * page 3, line 13 - page 7, line 21; figures 1-4,9 * [I] 6,7,14 | International search | [A]US3127702 (KARSTEDT ELMER C); | [X]US3331170 (NEVILLE LOWE JAMES, et al); | [Y]US3514910 (COMM DANIEL); | [A]US5584151 (ABOU-RACHED ROGER GEORGES [CA]); | [X]US7827738 (ABRAMS ALEXANDER [US], et al) |