Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9353214 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2016 | B2 | US2014323664 | 30.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US70060 | 17.12.2012 | US201161576527 | 16.12.2011 | US201214359693 | 17.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103987739B | Global Dossier | 05.04.2017 | B | CN103987739 | 13.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US70060 | 17.12.2012 | US201161576527 | 16.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2791187 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2015 | A4 | EP2791187 | 22.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US70060 | 17.12.2012 | US201161576527 | 16.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2859134 | 20.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US70060 | 17.12.2012 | US201161576527 | 16.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013090892 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161576527 | 16.12.2011 |