EP2791187 - SUBSTITUTED PHENACYL MOLECULES AND PHOTORESPONSIVE POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Akron 302 East Buchtel Common Akron, OH 44325 / US | [2014/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOY, Abraham 514 Silver Ridge Drive Copley, Ohio 44321 / US | 02 /
SUN, Shuangyi Goodyear Polymer Center, Room 411 The University of Akron 302 E. Buchtel Common Akron, Ohio 44325 / US | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Tetzner, Michael, et al Tetzner & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Tetzner, Michael, et al TETZNER & PARTNER mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12858194.9 | 17.12.2012 | WO2012US70060 | Priority number, date | US201161576527P | 16.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161576527 P | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013090892 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2791187 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08F36/00, C08G64/16 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
C08G63/06 (EP,US);
C08G63/664 (US);
C07C49/245 (US);
C08F26/06 (US);
C08G63/02 (US);
C08G63/19 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/43] | C08F36/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE PHENACYLMOLEKÜLE UND LICHTEMPFINDLICHE POLYMERE | [2014/43] | English: | SUBSTITUTED PHENACYL MOLECULES AND PHOTORESPONSIVE POLYMERS | [2014/43] | French: | MOLÉCULES À PHÉNACYLE SUBSTITUÉ ET POLYMÈRES PHOTOSENSIBLES | [2014/43] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 16.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/01] | deleted | Deletion: Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/11] | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/01] | 28.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4321118 (FELDER LOUIS, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 19; examples 21,23 *; | [A]US4883857 (GUILLET JAMES E [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * examples 1-7; claim 1 *; | [A]US5739175 (NOHR RONALD SINCLAIR [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 6, lines 48-65; examples 1-3 *; | [A]US2001007880 (MARCHIN BRIGITTE [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0227] *; | [A]US2004096663 (YAMAGUCHI YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0068]; example compounds (6) and (7) *; | [A]US2006268083 (KUNITA KAZUTO [JP]) [A] 1-15* examples G-2, H-2 *; | [IA]US2009062418 (BELELIE JENNIFER L [CA]) [I] 15 * paragraph [0030] * [A] 1-14; | [XA]CN101921184 (SHENZHEN YOUWEI CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 15 * paragraph [0103] * [A] 1-14 | International search | [A]US4190671 (MAILE GRAHAM K [GB], et al); | [X]US4321118 (FELDER LOUIS, et al); | [X]US5739175 (NOHR RONALD SINCLAIR [US], et al); | [X]US2001007880 (MARCHIN BRIGITTE [FR], et al); | [A]US2002012873 (JUNG JAE CHANG [KR], et al); | [X]US2004096663 (YAMAGUCHI YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al); | [X]US2006268083 (KUNITA KAZUTO [JP]) |