EP2788492 - METHODS OF MODULATING STOMATA CONDUCTANCE AND PLANT EXPRESSION CONSTRUCTS FOR EXECUTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The State of Israel, Ministry of Agriculture and Rural Development, Agricultural Research Organisation, Volcani Center P.O. Box 6 5025001 Beit Dagan / IL | For all designated states Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Ltd. Hi Tech Park The Edmond J. Safra Campus The Hebrew University of Jerusalem Givat Ram 9139002 Jerusalem / IL | [2017/18] |
Former [2014/42] | For all designated states The State of Israel, Ministry of Agriculture and Rural Development, Agricultural Research Organisation, Volcani Center P.O. Box 6 50250 Beit Dagan / IL | ||
For all designated states Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Ltd. Hi Tech Park The Edmond J. Safra Campus The Hebrew University of Jerusalem Givat Ram 9139002 Jerusalem / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRANOT, David 4 Bustenai Street 9210608 Jerusalem / IL | 02 /
KELLY, Gilor 20 HaZayit Street 7680300 Beit-Elazari / IL | 03 /
MOSHELION, Menachem 16A HaMaApil Street 7634816 Rechovot / IL | [2014/42] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2017/36] |
Former [2014/42] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Poccistrasse 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12858594.0 | 11.12.2012 | [2017/36] | WO2012IL50519 | Priority number, date | US201161569251P | 11.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161569251 P | [2014/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013088438 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2788492 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2788492 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 20.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, A01H5/10, A01H5/12, C12N15/113, C12N15/54, A01H5/02 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
C12N15/8273 (EP,US);
A01H5/02 (RU);
A01H5/10 (RU);
A01H5/12 (RU);
C12N15/113 (RU);
C12N15/82 (RU);
C12N15/8218 (EP,US);
C12N15/8241 (US);
C12N15/8261 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MODULIERUNG DER STOMATALEITFÄHIGKEIT UND PFLANZLICHE EXPRESSIONSKONSTRUKTE ZU SEINER DURCHFÜHRUNG | [2014/42] | English: | METHODS OF MODULATING STOMATA CONDUCTANCE AND PLANT EXPRESSION CONSTRUCTS FOR EXECUTING SAME | [2014/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE MODULATION DE CONDUCTANCE STOMATIQUE ET CONSTRUCTIONS D'EXPRESSION DE PLANTE POUR EXÉCUTER CES PROCÉDÉS | [2014/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 21.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2012 | AL | 06.09.2017 | AT | 06.09.2017 | CY | 06.09.2017 | CZ | 06.09.2017 | DK | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | FI | 06.09.2017 | HR | 06.09.2017 | LT | 06.09.2017 | LV | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | MK | 06.09.2017 | PL | 06.09.2017 | PT | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | RS | 06.09.2017 | SE | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SK | 06.09.2017 | SM | 06.09.2017 | TR | 06.09.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | NO | 06.12.2017 | GR | 07.12.2017 | IE | 11.12.2017 | LU | 11.12.2017 | MT | 11.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | IS | 06.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 11.12.2012 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MK | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 11.12.2012 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MK | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 11.12.2012 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MK | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 11.12.2012 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 11.12.2012 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 06.09.2017 | |
NO | 06.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2007116394 (ISRAEL STATE [IL], et al); | [A]EP1962577 (MONSANTO TECHNOLOGY LLC [US]); | by applicant | EP0067553 | EP0194809 | US4666828 | US4683202 | WO8706261 | JPS6314693 | EP0278667 | US4801531 | US4855237 | US4945050 | US5034323 | US5192659 | WO9307278 | US5231020 | US5272057 | US5316931 | US5464765 | US5693507 | US5759829 | WO9836083 | WO9853083 | WO9932619 | US5942657 | WO9949029 | WO9953050 | WO9961631 | WO0049035 | US6326527 | WO0200904 | US2002048814 | US6452067 | US6573099 | US2003175965 | US2003180945 | US6646805 | US6777588 | US2004214330 | US7423203 | US2009265812 |