EP2796586 - STEEL FOR MECHANICAL STRUCTURE FOR COLD WORKING, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 2-4, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 2-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASHITA, Koji c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5 Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 02 /
TSUCHIDA, Takehiro c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5 Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 03 /
CHIBA, Masamichi c/o Kobe Works in Kobe Steel, Ltd. Nadahamahigashi-cho 2 Nada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 657-0863 / JP | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12859127.8 | 11.12.2012 | WO2012JP82063 | Priority number, date | JP20110277683 | 19.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011277683 | JP20120070365 | 26.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012070365 | [2014/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013094475 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2796586 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/06, C22C38/54, C21D8/06, C21D1/32, C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/08, C22C38/12, C22C38/16, C22C38/14, C22C38/18, C22C38/22, C21D8/02, C21D8/00 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
C22C38/22 (EP,US);
C21D1/32 (EP,US);
C21D8/0226 (EP,US);
C21D8/06 (EP,US);
C21D8/065 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/08 (EP,US);
C22C38/12 (EP,US);
C22C38/14 (EP,US);
C22C38/16 (EP,US);
C22C38/18 (EP,US);
C22C38/48 (EP,US);
C22C38/50 (EP,US);
C21D2211/005 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/44] | C22C38/06, C22C38/54, C21D8/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Title | German: | STAHL FÜR EINE MECHANISCHE STRUKTUR ZUR KALTBEARBEITUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/44] | English: | STEEL FOR MECHANICAL STRUCTURE FOR COLD WORKING, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2014/44] | French: | ACIER POUR STRUCTURE MÉCANIQUE POUR L'ÉCROUISSAGE FROIDE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2014 | Translation filed | 12.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 08.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/46] | 28.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1281782 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0041]; table 1 *; | [A]US2002179207 (KOIKE SEIICHI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0061]; tables 1,2 * | International search | [A]JP2009275252 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JP2010236005 (JFE STEEL CORP); | [A]JP2010159476 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JPH1112684 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [AE]JP2013007088 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [AE]JP2013007090 (KOBE STEEL LTD) | by applicant | JP2000119809 | JP2009275252 | JP2000073137 |