EP2796476 - EMULSIFYING AGENT FOR EMULSION POLYMERIZATION, AND EMULSION POLYMERIZATION METHOD USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai-Ichi Kogyo Seiyaku Co., Ltd. 55, Nishi-shichijo Higashikubo-cho Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8873 / JP | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGASAWARA, Asako c/o DAI-ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO. LTD. 55 Nishishichijo Higashikubo-cho Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8873 / JP | 02 /
HASHIMOTO, Masayuki c/o DAI-ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO. LTD. 55 Nishishichijo Higashikubo-cho Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8873 / JP | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Enomoto, Kéi, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Enomoto, Kéi, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12861020.1 | 12.12.2012 | WO2012JP07950 | Priority number, date | JP20110278271 | 20.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011278271 | JP20120155785 | 11.07.2012 Original published format: JP 2012155785 | [2014/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013094158 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2796476 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/24, B01F17/02, B01F17/14, B01F17/42, B01F17/44, C08F212/00, C08F290/14, C08G65/28, C09D133/10, C08F220/18 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
C08F220/1804 (EP,US);
C08F2/24 (US);
C08F2/26 (EP,US);
C08F2/30 (EP,US);
C08F212/00 (US);
C08F212/08 (EP,US);
C08F218/08 (EP,US);
C08F220/14 (EP,US);
C08F290/142 (EP,US);
C08G65/14 (EP,US);
C08G65/2612 (EP,US);
C08G65/326 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F290/142, C08F212/08 (US,EP);
C08F290/142, C08F218/08 (US,EP);
C08F290/142, C08F218/08, C08F220/1804 (EP,US);
C08F290/142, C08F220/06 (US,EP);
C08F290/142, C08F236/06 (US,EP);
C08F212/08, C08F216/145, C08F220/06, C08F220/1804 (EP,US);
C08F212/08, C08F220/1804, C08F216/145, C08F220/06 (US);
C08F212/08, C08F220/1804, C08F216/1466, C08F220/06 (EP);
C08F212/08, C08F220/1804, C08F220/06 (US,EP);
C08F212/08, C08F220/1804, C08F230/02, C08F220/06 (US,EP);
C08F218/08, C08F220/1804 (EP,US);
C08F218/08, C08F220/1804, C08F216/145 (US,EP);
C08F218/08, C08F220/1804, C08F216/1466 (EP);
C08F220/14, C08F220/1804, C08F216/145, C08F220/06 (US,EP);
C08F220/14, C08F220/1804, C08F216/1466, C08F220/06 (EP);
C08F220/14, C08F220/1804, C08F220/06 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2014/44] | C08F2/24, B01F17/02, B01F17/14, B01F17/42, B01F17/44, C08F212/00, C08F290/14, C08G65/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Title | German: | EMULGATOR FÜR DIE EMULSIONSPOLYMERISATION UND EMULSIONSPOLYMERISATIONSVERFAHREN DAMIT | [2014/44] | English: | EMULSIFYING AGENT FOR EMULSION POLYMERIZATION, AND EMULSION POLYMERIZATION METHOD USING SAME | [2014/44] | French: | AGENT ÉMULSIFIANT POUR POLYMÉRISATION EN ÉMULSION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE POLYMÉRISATION EN ÉMULSION L'UTILISANT | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2014 | Translation filed | 19.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 11.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/36] | 12.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0244841 (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 1, lines 4-6 * * examples 3,7,8,9; compound (I) to (VI) * [I] 4; | [A]EP1369434 (ASAHI DENKA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4* paragraphs [0010] - [0011] - [0 81] - [0106] *; | [E]WO2013059765 (ETHOX CHEMICALS LLC [US]) [E] 1,2 * examples 1,2; compounds (I), (II) * | International search | [X]JPS62286528 (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD); | [X]JPS6312334 (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD); | [A]JPS6377531 (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD); | [A]JPS6384625 (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD); | [A]JP2002301353 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK) | by applicant | JPS6354927 | JPS63319035 | JPH0450204 |