23.06.2023 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
24.03.2023 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.02.2023 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.01.2023 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.08.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.01.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.08.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.04.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.04.2020 |
First examination report |
|
02.01.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.12.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.02.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.02.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
30.01.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
30.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.11.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
13.11.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
13.11.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
13.11.2015 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
23.04.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.03.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] |
18.02.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
16.12.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.10.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] |
03.10.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] |
24.06.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|