EP2798329 - SAMPLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nextteq, LLC 8406 Benjamin Road Suite J Tampa, FL 33634 / US | For all designated states Mihaylov, Gueorgui M. 1745 Lake Christopher Drive Virginia Beach, VA 23464 / US | For all designated states Truex, Bryan I. 64 Bahama Circle Tampa, FL 33606 / US | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIHAYLOV, Gueorgui M. 1745 Lake Christopher Drive Virginia Beach, VA 23464 / US | 02 /
TRUEX, Bryan, I. 64 Bahama Circle Tampa, FL 33606 / US | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Smee, Anthony James Michael Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 12861231.4 | 28.12.2012 | WO2012US71994 | Priority number, date | US201161580863P | 28.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161580863 P | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013102028 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2798329 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/22, B65D21/08, B65D85/00, G01N1/10 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
G01N1/10 (EP,US);
G01N1/00 (US);
G01N1/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/45] | G01N1/22, B65D21/08, B65D85/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Title | German: | PROBENAHMEVORRICHTUNG | [2014/45] | English: | SAMPLING DEVICE | [2014/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCHANTILLONNAGE | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 14.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/30] | 23.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2016 | 31.12.2022 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4338826 (JACOBY MARVIN, et al) [X] 1-3,5,9,10 * figures 1,4 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 3 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 3 * * column 5, line 43 - line 62 * [I] 6-8,15,16; | [XI]US2011197687 (MIHAYLOV GUEORGUI [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9-14 * figures 1-2 * * paragraphs [0051] - [0054] * [I] 6-8,15,16; | [A]WO2011106680 (NEXTTEQ LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 6 ** paragraphs [0066] - [0068] * | International search | [A]US5411482 (CAMPBELL ROBERT E [US]); | [A]US2004007590 (HEDINGTON JOHN GRAHAM [GB], et al); | [A]US2009123093 (LEMOYNE CLAUDE [CA], et al); | [A]US2011202031 (MIHAYLOV GUEORGUI [US], et al); | [X]US2011219891 (MIHAYLOV GUEORGUI [US], et al) | by applicant | US4338826 |