EP2800389 - UI SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTERACTION BETWEEN HANDHELD DEVICE AND TV SET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 70 Huifeng 4rd ZhongKai Hi-tech Development District Huizhou, Guangdong 516006 / CN | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jiang Zeng, Hu 70 Huifeng 4rd Zhongkai Hi-tech Development District Huizhou Guangdong 516006 / CN | 02 /
YU, Jingjiang Zeng, Hu 70 Huifeng 4rd Zhongkai Hi-tech Development District Huizhou Guangdong 516006 / CN | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Brachmann, Roland W. Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze Patentanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 12A 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12862098.6 | 17.09.2012 | WO2012CN81504 | Priority number, date | CN201110447137 | 28.12.2011 Original published format: CN201110447137 | [2014/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013097492 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2800389 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/422, G06F3/14, H04N21/41, H04N21/4363 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
H04N21/4222 (EP,US);
G06F1/1626 (EP,US);
G06F3/03547 (EP,US);
G06F3/038 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
H04N21/41265 (EP,US);
H04N21/42224 (EP,US);
H04N21/43635 (EP,US);
G06F3/1454 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0407 (EP,US);
G09G2370/04 (EP,US);
G09G2370/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/45] | H04N21/422 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Title | German: | BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLENSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR INTERAKTION ZWISCHEN EINER TRAGBAREN VORRICHTUNG UND EINEM FERNSEHER | [2014/45] | English: | UI SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTERACTION BETWEEN HANDHELD DEVICE AND TV SET | [2014/45] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ INTERACTIFS POUR UN ÉQUIPEMENT PORTABLE ET UN POSTE DE TV SUR UNE UI | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2014 | Translation filed | 28.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 09.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006026521 (HOTELLING STEVE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0118] * * figures 4,5,17A-17E,21A-21E *; | [A]US2010060549 (TSERN ELY [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2011163966 (CHAUDHRI IMRAN [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0126] * * paragraph [0162] - paragraph [0163] * * figures 1C,2,4C *; | [XI]WO2011145700 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [X] 4,9 * abstract * [I] 1-3,5-8,10-15; | [A]US2011289113 (ARLING PAUL D [US], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | EP2574044 [ ] (SHARP KK [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0143] * * figures 1-3,17 * | International search | [A]JP2008109341 (SHARP KK); | [Y]CN101489076 (TCL AV TECHNOLY ELECTRONICS HU [CN]); | [Y]JP2011217236 (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO); | [XP]CN102572567 (HUIZHOU TCL MOBILE COMM CO LTD) |