EP2797400 - EMBRYO INSERTION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weyerhaeuser Nr Company P.O. Box 9777 CH1J27 Federal Way, WA 98063-9777 / US | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEODORO, Michael, W. 2215 Nevada Ct. Tacoma, WA 98354 / US | 02 /
RUBATINO, Frederick, T. 1127 51st Ne Tacoma, WA 98422 / US | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 12862380.8 | 13.12.2012 | WO2012US69532 | Priority number, date | US201161581832P | 30.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161581832 P | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013101486 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2797400 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01C1/06 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
A01H4/006 (EP,US);
A01C1/06 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Title | German: | EMBRYOEINSETZSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2014/45] | English: | EMBRYO INSERTION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2014/45] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSERTION D'EMBRYONS | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 20.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/42] | 29.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2739251 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [A] 1-16* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5377727 (UEDA MICHIO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2005013892 (DOWNS PERRY CHRISTOPHER [GB], et al); | [Y]US2005133528 (HIRAHARA EDWIN [US]); | [Y]US2006032121 (HIRAHARA EDWIN [US]); | [Y]US2011072716 (HARTLE JEFFREY E [US], et al) | by applicant | US6684564 | US7207139 | US7603807 |