EP2799075 - MAILLARD REACTION INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Morishita Jintan Co., Ltd. 2-40, Tamatsukuri 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-8566 / JP | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIDA, Norihisa c/o MORISHITA JINTAN CO. LTD. 2-40 Tamatsukuri 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-8566 / JP | 02 /
NAGATOMO, Akifumi c/o MORISHITA JINTAN CO. LTD. 2-40 Tamatsukuri 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-8566 / JP | 03 /
ITO, Hideyuki 5-25 Nodayacho 1-chome Kita-ku Okayama-shi Okayama 700-0815 / JP | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Schlich, George William Schlich 9 St. Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Schlich, George Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12863697.4 | 27.12.2012 | WO2012JP83992 | Priority number, date | JP20110285694 | 27.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011285694 | [2014/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013100105 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2799075 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7024, A23L1/30, A23L1/305, A23L2/52, A61K8/60, A61K8/97, A61K36/00, A61K36/18, A61P3/10, A61P13/12, A61P17/16, A61P25/02, A61P27/02, A61P43/00, A61Q19/08, C07H13/08, // A61P39/06 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
A61K31/7048 (EP,US);
A23L2/52 (EP,US);
A23L2/66 (EP,US);
A23L3/3472 (EP,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A23L33/17 (EP,US);
A23L5/27 (EP,US);
A61K31/366 (EP,US);
A61K36/185 (EP,US);
A61K8/347 (EP,US);
A61K8/498 (EP,US);
A61K8/60 (US);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/366, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/7048, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/302, A23V2200/328, A23V2250/2132, A23V2250/5422 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/45] | A61K31/7024, A23L1/30, A23L1/305, A23L2/52, A61K8/60, A61K8/97, A61K36/00, A61K36/18, A61P3/10, A61P13/12, A61P17/16, A61P25/02, A61P27/02, A61P43/00, A61Q19/08, C07H13/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Title | German: | MAILLARD-REAKTIONSINHIBITOR | [2014/45] | English: | MAILLARD REACTION INHIBITOR | [2014/45] | French: | INHIBITEUR D'UNE RÉACTION DE MAILLARD | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2014 | Translation filed | 10.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 17.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 21.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2000143491 (POLA CHEM IND INC) [Y] 6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0013] *; | [IY]JP2002241299 (ICHIMARU PHARCOS INC) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0009] , [0012] , [0022] * [Y] 1-9; | [A]JP2006256977 (UNIV KANSAI) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0010] *; | [IY]US2010009019 (BATES BYRON [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0006] - [0007] - [0011] - [0015] - [0020] , [0024] , [0025] , [0038] , [0044] , [0046] * [Y] 1-9; | [IY]US2010278992 (VINOKUR YAKOV [IL], et al) [I] 1-5,7-9 * paragraphs [0009] , [0014] - [0027] - [0042] , [0043] , [0054] , [0059] , [0068] , [0125] * * table 1 * * figure 3 * [Y] 6; | [XY]WO2011011721 (AMAZENTIS SA [CZ], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 1, lines 26-28 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0009] , [0012] , [0022] * * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 1 * * page 7, line 24 * * page 10, line 27 - page 11, line 1 * * page 20, lines 15-16 * * page 26, lines 11-18 * * page 28, line 26 - page 30, line 20 * * page 34, lines 3-11 * [Y] 6; | [AP]JP2012121874 (MARUZEN PHARMA) [AP] 1-9* paragraphs [0003] , [0009] , [0010] , [0023] , [0056] , [0057] , [0062] , [0072] *; | [IY] - Ahmad Esmaillzadeh ET AL, "Concentrated Pomegranate Juice Improves Lipid Profiles in Diabetic Patients with Hyperlipidemia", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL FOOD J Med Food Inc. and Korean Society of Food Science and Nutrition, (20040101), pages 305 - 308, URL: http://online.liebertpub.com/doi/pdf/10.1089/jmf.2004.7.305, (20150519), XP055189946 [I] 1-5,7-9 * abstract * * page 307 - page 308 * [Y] 1-5,7-9 | [IY] - LI Y ET AL, "Evaluation of antioxidant properties of pomegranate peel extract in comparison with pomegranate pulp extract", FOOD CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER LTD, NL, vol. 96, no. 2, ISSN 0308-8146, (20060501), pages 254 - 260, (20060501), XP027989162 [I] 1-5,8,9 * abstract * * page 255 * * page 257 * * table 1 * [Y] 6,7 | [T] - TAKASHI YOSHIDA ET AL, "Structural Features and Biological Properties of Ellagitannins in Some Plant Families of the Order Myrtales", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR SCIENCES, (20100106), vol. 11, no. 1, doi:10.3390/ijms11010079, ISSN 1661-6596, pages 79 - 106, XP055191670 [T] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1,2,6b * * tables 1,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/ijms11010079 | International search | [X]JP2000143491 (POLA CHEM IND INC); | [X]JP2002241299 (ICHIMARU PHARCOS INC); | [X]JP2008542283 (POM WONDERFUL, L.L.C.); | [X]JP2010534488 (THE STATE OF ISRAEL, MINISTRY OF AGRICULTURE & RURAL DEVELOPMENT, AGRI); | [X]WO2011011721 (AMAZENTIS SA [CZ], et al); | [XP]JP2012121874 (MARUZEN PHARMA) | by applicant | JP2002241299 | JP2005035911 | JP2006256977 | JP2008214250 | JP2011102270 | - Explanation on Analytic Manual of Food Recorded in 5th Revised Standard Table of Food Composition in Japan, CHUOHOKI PUBLISHING CO., LTD., (2001), page 254 | - J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2009), vol. 57, no. 16, page 7395 |