Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
04.02.2017 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.10.2016 | Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
26.07.2016 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.02.2016 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
13.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant | |
24.04.2015 | Change - applicant | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
17.04.2015 | Change - classification | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
17.04.2015 | Change - classification | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
17.04.2015 | Change - date of supplementary search report | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
06.03.2015 | Change - extension states | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] |
13.01.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant | |
10.01.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
10.01.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
06.11.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.10.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.10.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.07.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.07.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication |