EP2696324 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING CORRECTION AND TEACHING SERVICES OVER NETWORK AND WEB SERVER USED IN SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEO.LAB CONVERGENCE INC 216, Teheran-ro32-gil, Gangnam-gu SEOUL 135-921 / KR | [2015/22] |
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states Intellectual Discovery Co., Ltd. Golden Tower 10th Floor 511, Samseong-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-745 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Sang-Gyu 102-404 Raemian Seocho7 cha Apt. 1642-34 Seocho-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-070 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Suk-Joo 704-107 Dodam Maeul Tteurieche Jukjeon-dong Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-160 / KR | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12863818.6 | 28.12.2012 | WO2012KR11682 | Priority number, date | KR20110145580 | 29.12.2011 Original published format: KR 20110145580 | [2014/07] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013100681 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2696324 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/20, G09B5/04, G09B5/02, H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
G06Q50/20 (EP,KR,US);
G09B5/02 (US);
G09B5/04 (US);
H04L67/12 (US);
H04L67/131 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/07] | G06Q50/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON KORREKTUR- UND LEHRSERVICES ÜBER EIN NETZWERK UND IN DIESEM VERFAHREN VERWENDETER WEBSERVER | [2014/07] | English: | METHOD FOR PROVIDING CORRECTION AND TEACHING SERVICES OVER NETWORK AND WEB SERVER USED IN SAID METHOD | [2014/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FOURNIR DES SERVICES DE CORRECTION ET D'ENSEIGNEMENT SUR UN RÉSEAU ET SERVEUR WEB UTILISÉS POUR LEDIT PROCÉDÉ | [2014/07] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2013 | Translation filed | 30.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 12.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/11] | 04.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2008150923 (LIVESCRIBE INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2008150919 (LIVESCRIBE INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2009124153 (LIVESCRIBE INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2009251337 (MARGGRAFF JIM [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2009251336 (MARGGRAFF JIM [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2009251441 (EDGECOMB TRACY L [US], et al) [I] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JP2003345232 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]KR20110100769 (TSTUDY CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20110100770 (TSTUDY CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20110134662 (TSTUDY CO LTD [KR]) |