EP2800717 - ELEVATOR ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR READJUSTING THE ELEVATOR ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kone Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2014/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BJÖRNI, Osmo Vallesmanninkatu 13 FI-05830 Hyvinkää / FI | 02 /
HÄNNINEN, Ari Nurmelanpolku 14 FI-05830 Hyvinkää / FI | 03 /
DE JONG, Johannes Kauhajoenkuja 1 FI-04430 Järvenpää / FI | 04 /
ALASENTIE, Pentti Huvilaharju 33 FI-02730 Espoo / FI | 05 /
RÄSÄNEN, Matti Helenenkatu 16-20 B 21 FI-05800 Hyvinkää / FI | 06 /
MERTANEN, Timo Luuvanniementie 14 A 27 FI-00350 Helsinki / FI | 07 /
SUORANTA, Santeri Ajomiehentie 2A FI-02940 Espoo / FI | 08 /
PLATHIN, Antti Kersantintie 3 FI-01700 Vantaa / FI | 09 /
KALLIONIEMI, Antti Kaarretie 26 FI-05400 Jokela / FI | [2014/46] | Representative(s) | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Franz-Mayer-Str. 16a 93053 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/07] | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2014/46] | Graf Glück Kritzenberger Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12864191.7 | 14.12.2012 | [2019/07] | WO2012FI51247 | Priority number, date | FI20120005001 | 02.01.2012 Original published format: FI 20125001 | [2014/46] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013102698 | Date: | 11.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2800717 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2800717 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 11.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B66B9/00, B66B1/24, B66B5/28, B66B11/00 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
B66B9/00 (EP,US);
B66B9/187 (FI);
B66B1/2433 (FI);
B66B1/2458 (FI);
B66B1/2466 (FI);
B66B11/0005 (EP,US);
B66B11/0095 (EP,US);
B66B20/00 (FI);
B66B2201/305 (EP);
B66B2201/307 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/46] | B66B9/00, B66B1/24, B66B5/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFZUGSANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR EINSTELLUNG DER AUFZUGSANORDNUNG | [2014/46] | English: | ELEVATOR ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR READJUSTING THE ELEVATOR ARRANGEMENT | [2014/46] | French: | AGENCEMENT D'ASCENSEURS ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉAJUSTAGE DE L'AGENCEMENT D'ASCENSEURS | [2014/46] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 01.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2012 | AL | 13.02.2019 | AT | 13.02.2019 | CY | 13.02.2019 | CZ | 13.02.2019 | DK | 13.02.2019 | EE | 13.02.2019 | ES | 13.02.2019 | FI | 13.02.2019 | HR | 13.02.2019 | IT | 13.02.2019 | LT | 13.02.2019 | LV | 13.02.2019 | MC | 13.02.2019 | MK | 13.02.2019 | MT | 13.02.2019 | NL | 13.02.2019 | PL | 13.02.2019 | RO | 13.02.2019 | RS | 13.02.2019 | SE | 13.02.2019 | SI | 13.02.2019 | SK | 13.02.2019 | SM | 13.02.2019 | TR | 13.02.2019 | BG | 13.05.2019 | NO | 13.05.2019 | GR | 14.05.2019 | IS | 13.06.2019 | PT | 13.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 14.12.2012 | |
AL | 13.02.2019 | ||
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
MT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 14.12.2012 | |
AL | 13.02.2019 | ||
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 13.02.2019 | |
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 13.02.2019 | |
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JP2006168931 (TOSHIBA ELEVATOR CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] , [0034] - [0066] * [A] 19 [Y] 2-18; | [YA]WO2011148032 (KONE CORP [FI], et al) [Y] 2-5,9-18 * page 13 - page 22; figures 1-3 * [A] 1,19; | [YA]WO2004071923 (KONE CORP [FI], et al) [Y] 6-8 * page 11, line 30 - page 23, line 5; figures 1-7 * [A] 1,13,19; | [A]US2005077115 (URATA MASAZUMI [JP]) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0032] - [0098]; figures 1-8 * | International search | [A]US2002084148 (NYGREN GUNNAR [SE]); | [X]JP2003182951 (KAJIMA CORP); | [A]WO03101874 (KONE CORP [FI], et al); | [Y]WO2004071923 (KONE CORP [FI], et al); | [X]JP2006103887 (FUJITEC KK); | [X]JP2006168931 (TOSHIBA ELEVATOR CO LTD); | [A]US2008149428 (KOCHER HANS [CH], et al); | [A]US2010018809 (PEACOCK MARK [FI], et al) |