EP2798517 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CREATING AN INTELLIGENT SOCIAL NETWORK BETWEEN PLURALITY OF DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Consultancy Services Limited Nirmal Building, 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai, Maharashtra / IN | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINHA, Priyanka Tata Consultancy Services Plot A2 M2&N2 Sector V, Block GP, Salt Lake Electronics Complex Kolkata 700091 / IN | 02 /
BHAUMIK, Chirabrata Tata Consultancy Services Plot A2 M2&N2 Sector V, Block GP, Salt Lake Electronics Complex Kolkata 700091 / IN | 03 /
GHOSE, Avik Tata Consultancy Services Plot A2 M2&N2 Sector V, Block GP, Salt Lake Electronics Complex Kolkata 700091 / IN | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 12864936.5 | 27.12.2012 | WO2012IN00858 | Priority number, date | IN2011MUM3674 | 27.12.2011 Original published format: IN 3674MU2011 | [2017/16] |
Former [2014/45] | INMM36742011 | 27.12.2011 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013105115 | Date: | 18.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2798517 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, H04L29/08, H04L12/58 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04L67/535 (US);
H04L51/52 (US);
H04L67/02 (US);
H04L67/10 (US);
H04L67/306 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/45] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM ERZEUGEN EINES INTELLIGENTEN SOZIALEN NETZWERKS ZWISCHEN MEHREREN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2014/45] | English: | A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CREATING AN INTELLIGENT SOCIAL NETWORK BETWEEN PLURALITY OF DEVICES | [2014/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR CRÉER UN RÉSEAU SOCIAL INTELLIGENT ENTRE UNE PLURALITÉ DE DISPOSITIFS | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 03.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.03.2023 | 15.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/26] | 25.02.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/26] | 14.03.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2020 | 31.12.2021 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010299615 (MILUZZO EMILIANO [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0029] * * paragraphs [0013] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0044] - [0048] * * paragraphs [0054] , [0062] * * paragraphs [0072] - [0076] *; | [X]US2011282972 (ROSEN JAMES S [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0007] , [0008] * * paragraphs [0018] - [0049] ** paragraphs [0070] - [0071] * | International search | [Y]US2008040475 (BOSWORTH ANDREW [US], et al); | [A]US2008294678 (GORMAN SEAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2009328122 (AMENTO BRIAN [US], et al); | [Y]WO2010077960 (DEEDA INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2011010615 (DEES WALTER [NL], et al); | [Y]EP2306683 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]); | [X]US2011145050 (GROSS PATRICIA JANE [US], et al); | [A]US2011258303 (NATH BADRI [US], et al) |