EP2742621 - REDUCED SIGNALING OVERHEAD DURING RADIO RESOURCE CONTROL (RRC) STATE TRANSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2016/14] |
Former [2014/25] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard MS: RNB-4-150 Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUPTA, Maruti 1435 SW Montgomery Street Portland, Oregon 97201 / US | 02 /
KOC, Ali 2418 NW Wessex Terrace Hillsboro, Oregon 97124 / US | 03 /
VANNITHAMBY, Rath 13470 NW Alvada Street Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | Hufton, David Alan HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [2014/25] | Application number, filing date | 12865193.2 | 10.04.2012 | [2016/14] | WO2012US32922 | Priority number, date | US201161522623P | 11.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161522623 P | [2014/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013106060 | Date: | 18.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2742621 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2742621 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/04 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
H04W56/00 (EP,US);
H04L65/1104 (EP,BR,US);
H04B7/2603 (KR);
H04L12/189 (US);
H04L12/18 (US);
H04L12/1863 (US);
H04L5/0037 (US);
H04L65/1016 (EP,BR,US);
H04L65/1045 (EP,BR,US);
H04L65/1069 (EP,BR,US);
H04L65/80 (EP,BR,US);
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04N21/23439 (EP,BR,US);
H04N21/6131 (EP,BR,US);
H04N21/64707 (EP,BR,US);
H04N21/8456 (EP,BR,US);
H04W4/06 (EP,US);
H04W4/08 (EP,BR,US);
H04W4/70 (EP,BR,US);
H04W72/30 (US);
H04W76/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/25] | H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REDUZIERTER SIGNAL-OVERHEAD WÄHREND DER STATUSÜBERGÄNGE VON FUNKRESSOURCENSTEUERUNGEN | [2014/25] | English: | REDUCED SIGNALING OVERHEAD DURING RADIO RESOURCE CONTROL (RRC) STATE TRANSITIONS | [2014/25] | French: | SURDÉBIT DE SIGNALISATION RÉDUIT AU COURS DE TRANSITIONS ENTRE DES ÉTATS RRC ("RADIO RESOURCE CONTROL") | [2014/25] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 15.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.04.2016 | BE | 06.04.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | CY | 06.04.2016 | CZ | 06.04.2016 | DK | 06.04.2016 | FI | 06.04.2016 | HR | 06.04.2016 | IT | 06.04.2016 | LT | 06.04.2016 | LV | 06.04.2016 | MC | 06.04.2016 | MK | 06.04.2016 | PL | 06.04.2016 | RO | 06.04.2016 | RS | 06.04.2016 | SE | 06.04.2016 | SI | 06.04.2016 | SM | 06.04.2016 | TR | 06.04.2016 | IE | 10.04.2016 | LU | 10.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | NO | 06.07.2016 | IS | 06.08.2016 | PT | 08.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | BE | 06.04.2016 | |
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
TR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 10.04.2016 | ||
LU | 10.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | BE | 06.04.2016 | |
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 10.04.2016 | ||
LU | 10.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | BE | 06.04.2016 | |
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 10.04.2016 | ||
LU | 10.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | BE | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 10.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | BE | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | BE | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | BE | 06.04.2016 | |
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 06.04.2016 | |
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 06.04.2016 | |
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 06.04.2016 | |
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 06.04.2016 | |
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 06.04.2016 | |
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | BE | 30.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008028318 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-15* page 7, line 3 - line 15 *; | [A]US2008267061 (DIGIROLAMO ROCCO [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0055] *; | [A]US2010111039 (KIM SOENG HUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0053]; figures 3,4 * * paragraph [0053] *; | [A]EP2252127 (HTC CORP [TW]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * | International search | [A]US2010111039 (KIM SOENG HUN [KR], et al); | [A]KR20100049483 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]KR20100105449 (HTC CORP [TW]); | [A]KR20100137499 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]KR20110035932 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | US2010111039 |