Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9388807 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2016 | B2 | US2014286807 | 25.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP82143 | 12.12.2012 | JP2012003257 | 11.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5774134B | Global Dossier | 02.09.2015 | B2 | JPWO2013105386 | 11.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP82143 | 12.12.2012 | JP2012003257 | 11.01.2012 | JP2013553219 | 12.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103930677B | Global Dossier | 24.08.2016 | B | CN103930677 | 16.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP82143 | 12.12.2012 | JP2012003257 | 11.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2803863 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2019 | B1 | EP2803863 | 16.09.2015 | A4 | EP2803863 | 19.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP82143 | 12.12.2012 | JP2012003257 | 11.01.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013105386 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012003257 | 11.01.2012 |