EP2798153 - FOSSIL RECOGNITION APPARATUS, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | [2017/49] |
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAY, Richard Thomas 24915 Corbin Gate Drive Spring, Texas 77389 / US | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2014/45] | Application number, filing date | 12866255.8 | 19.01.2012 | [2017/49] | WO2012US21861 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013109277 | Date: | 25.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2798153 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2798153 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E21B49/08, E21B47/00, E21B47/12 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
E21B47/002 (EP,RU,US);
E21B49/08 (EP,RU,US);
E21B47/12 (EP,RU,US);
E21B49/081 (EP,RU,US);
G01N33/241 (EP,US);
G06V40/16 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/45] | E21B49/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FOSSILENERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN | [2014/45] | English: | FOSSIL RECOGNITION APPARATUS, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS | [2014/45] | French: | APPAREIL, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE RECONNAISSANCE DE FOSSILES | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 10.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2012 | AL | 06.12.2017 | AT | 06.12.2017 | CY | 06.12.2017 | CZ | 06.12.2017 | DK | 06.12.2017 | EE | 06.12.2017 | ES | 06.12.2017 | FI | 06.12.2017 | HR | 06.12.2017 | IT | 06.12.2017 | LT | 06.12.2017 | LV | 06.12.2017 | MC | 06.12.2017 | MK | 06.12.2017 | NL | 06.12.2017 | PL | 06.12.2017 | PT | 06.12.2017 | RO | 06.12.2017 | RS | 06.12.2017 | SE | 06.12.2017 | SI | 06.12.2017 | SK | 06.12.2017 | SM | 06.12.2017 | TR | 06.12.2017 | IE | 19.01.2018 | LU | 19.01.2018 | MT | 19.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | FR | 06.02.2018 | BG | 06.03.2018 | GR | 07.03.2018 | IS | 06.04.2018 | DE | 01.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 19.01.2012 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MK | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
MT | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 06.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
DE | 01.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 19.01.2012 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
MT | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 06.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
DE | 01.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
MT | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 06.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
DE | 01.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
MT | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 06.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
DE | 01.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 06.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
DE | 01.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 06.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
DE | 01.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 06.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
DE | 01.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 06.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
DE | 01.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.01.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
DE | 01.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0747569 (SCHLUMBERGER LTD [US], et al) [X] 10,13 * column 4, line 42 - column 6, line 16; figure 2 *; | [XI]US2006243033 (FREEMARK DARCY [CA], et al) [X] 1,10,13 * paragraph [0061]; figures 1-7 * [I] 2-9,11,12,14,15; | [X]EP1882809 (SCHLUMBERGER SERVICES PETROL [FR], et al) [X] 10,13 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1,5 *; | [A]US2008235032 (EMAM OSSAMA [EG], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [X]EP2028341 (SCHLUMBERGER SERVICES PETROL [FR], et al) [X] 10,13 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0055]; figure 8 *; | [A]US2010258304 (HEGEMAN PETER S [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraphs [0034] , [0 36]; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US2010332210 (BIRDWELL J DOUGLAS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] * | International search | [Y]US2297083 (OSKAR SVENSSON); | [Y]US5109697 (MILLHEIM KEITH K [US], et al); | [Y]US2008235032 (EMAM OSSAMA [EG], et al); | [Y]US2010015601 (GILMORE JAMES [US], et al); | [Y]US2010258304 (HEGEMAN PETER S [US]); | [Y]US2010332210 (BIRDWELL J DOUGLAS [US], et al) | by applicant | EP0747569 | US2006243033 | EP1882809 | US2008235032 | EP2028341 | US2010258304 | US2010332210 |