08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
12.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
12.02.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
15.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
21.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
21.02.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
17.02.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.02.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.02.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.12.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.10.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.06.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.06.2018 |
First examination report |
|
25.05.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.12.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.07.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
10.07.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
10.07.2015 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
27.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.04.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] |
07.11.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
07.11.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
10.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.07.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|