EP2811294 - ULTRASONIC FLAW-DETECTION METHOD, ULTRASONIC FLAW-DETECTION DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING PIPE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-0011 / JP | [2014/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IIZUKA, Yukinori c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE Steel Corporation 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 02 /
OZEKI, Takafumi c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE Steel Corporation 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 03 /
MATSUI, Yutaka c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE Steel Corporation 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2014/50] | Application number, filing date | 12867508.9 | 09.05.2012 | [2020/13] | WO2012JP61836 | Priority number, date | JP20120017895 | 31.01.2012 Original published format: JP 2012017895 | [2014/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013114639 | Date: | 08.08.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2811294 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2811294 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/04, G01N29/07, G01N29/44 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
G01N29/041 (EP,US);
G01N29/04 (KR);
G01N29/043 (US);
G01N29/07 (EP,US);
G01N29/11 (EP,US);
G01N29/265 (EP,US);
G01N29/44 (KR);
G01N29/4427 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0234 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/50] | G01N29/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALL DEFEKTERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN, ULTRASCHALL-DEFEKTERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ROHRMATERIALS | [2014/50] | English: | ULTRASONIC FLAW-DETECTION METHOD, ULTRASONIC FLAW-DETECTION DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING PIPE MATERIAL | [2014/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE DÉFAUTS PAR ULTRASONS, DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE DÉFAUTS PAR ULTRASONS, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MATÉRIEL TUBULAIRE | [2014/50] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2014 | Translation filed | 30.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 27.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.05.2012 | AL | 25.03.2020 | AT | 25.03.2020 | CY | 25.03.2020 | CZ | 25.03.2020 | DK | 25.03.2020 | EE | 25.03.2020 | FI | 25.03.2020 | HR | 25.03.2020 | LT | 25.03.2020 | LV | 25.03.2020 | MC | 25.03.2020 | MK | 25.03.2020 | MT | 25.03.2020 | PL | 25.03.2020 | RO | 25.03.2020 | RS | 25.03.2020 | SE | 25.03.2020 | SI | 25.03.2020 | SK | 25.03.2020 | SM | 25.03.2020 | TR | 25.03.2020 | IE | 09.05.2020 | LU | 09.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | BG | 25.06.2020 | GB | 25.06.2020 | NO | 25.06.2020 | GR | 26.06.2020 | IS | 25.07.2020 | PT | 18.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 09.05.2012 | |
AL | 25.03.2020 | ||
AT | 25.03.2020 | ||
CY | 25.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
MT | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 09.05.2020 | ||
LU | 09.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GB | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 09.05.2012 | |
AT | 25.03.2020 | ||
CY | 25.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
MT | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 09.05.2020 | ||
LU | 09.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GB | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 09.05.2020 | ||
LU | 09.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GB | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 09.05.2020 | ||
LU | 09.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GB | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 09.05.2020 | ||
LU | 09.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GB | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 09.05.2020 | ||
LU | 09.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 09.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
NO | 25.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2010025807 (KANSAI X SEN KK) [X] 1-3,6-8,11-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0060] *[I] 4,5,9,10,14,15 | International search | [X]JPH049659 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [A]JPH06317418 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2002031625 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD); | [A]JP2003302381 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD); | [A]JP2006132981 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JP2011153974 (JFE STEEL CORP, et al) | by applicant | JP2008070325 |