|
04.01.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Information about intention to grant a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2016 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.12.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.12.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
05.08.2016 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.09.2014 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Amended drawings with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2013 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
13 |