EP2822242 - DIGITAL PREDISTORTION PROCESSING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2016/17] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
Former [2015/02] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Lin c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Peng c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
LEI, Hong c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2015/02] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2016/17] |
Former [2015/02] | Skinner, Michael Paul Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 12870172.9 | 19.06.2012 | [2016/17] | WO2012CN77131 | Priority number, date | CN20121047501 | 28.02.2012 Original published format: CN201210047501 | [2015/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013127141 | Date: | 06.09.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2822242 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2822242 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/24, H04B1/04, H04L25/02, H04L27/36, H04B17/13, H03F1/32 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
H04L27/368 (EP,US);
H04B1/0475 (US);
H03F1/02 (EP);
H03F1/3247 (EP,US);
H03F3/24 (EP,US);
H04B17/13 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/19] | H04L25/49, H04B7/06, H04B17/13, H03F1/32, H04L27/36 | ||
Former IPC [2015/02] | H04L25/49 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINER DIGITALEN VORVERZERRUNG | [2015/02] | English: | DIGITAL PREDISTORTION PROCESSING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2015/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE LA PRÉDISTORSION NUMÉRIQUE | [2015/02] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2014 | Translation filed | 24.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 02.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.06.2012 | AL | 27.04.2016 | AT | 27.04.2016 | BE | 27.04.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | CY | 27.04.2016 | CZ | 27.04.2016 | DK | 27.04.2016 | EE | 27.04.2016 | ES | 27.04.2016 | FI | 27.04.2016 | HR | 27.04.2016 | IS | 27.04.2016 | IT | 27.04.2016 | LT | 27.04.2016 | LV | 27.04.2016 | MC | 27.04.2016 | MK | 27.04.2016 | NL | 27.04.2016 | PL | 27.04.2016 | RO | 27.04.2016 | RS | 27.04.2016 | SE | 27.04.2016 | SI | 27.04.2016 | SK | 27.04.2016 | SM | 27.04.2016 | TR | 27.04.2016 | IE | 19.06.2016 | LU | 19.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | NO | 27.07.2016 | GR | 28.07.2016 | PT | 29.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 19.06.2012 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
TR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 19.06.2016 | ||
LU | 19.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 19.06.2012 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 19.06.2016 | ||
LU | 19.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 19.06.2012 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 19.06.2016 | ||
LU | 19.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 19.06.2012 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 19.06.2016 | ||
LU | 19.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 19.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 27.04.2016 | |
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | NL | 27.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010112364 (UBIDYNE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 4 ** paragraph [0047] * | International search | [A]CN101056128 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN102014090 (ZTE CORP); | [A]WO2011097844 (ZTE CORP [CN], et al) | by applicant | CN20081044447 |