EP2824567 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CUSTOMIZING FUNCTION MENU OF APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 70 Huifeng 4th ZhongKai Hi-tech Development District Huizhou, Guangdong 516006 / CN | [2015/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Zhibing Zeng, Hu 70 Huifeng 4th Road ZhongKai Hi-tech Development District Development Zone HuiZhou Guangdong 516006 / CN | [2015/03] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12870781.7 | 21.12.2012 | WO2012CN87146 | Priority number, date | CN20121058097 | 06.03.2012 Original published format: CN201210058097 | [2015/03] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013131396 | Date: | 12.09.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2824567 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F3/0482, G06F9/445 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F9/44505 (EP,US);
G06F9/451 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/03] | G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANPASSUNG DES FUNKTIONSMENÜS EINER ANWENDUNG | [2015/03] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CUSTOMIZING FUNCTION MENU OF APPLICATION | [2015/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DESTINÉS À PERSONNALISER LE MENU DE FONCTIONS D'UNE APPLICATION | [2015/03] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2014 | Translation filed | 21.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 08.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/04] | 17.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0322332 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-13 * column 3, line 17 - column 6, line 40 *; | [X]US2001006388 (KIM TAE HYOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0067] *; | [X]US2003098891 (MOLANDER MARK E [US]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0006] *; | [X]US2009019390 (SU CHIEN-CHENG [TW]) [X] 1,4-6,9-11 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0043] ** paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0049] * | International search | [A]CN1815440 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]); | [Y]CN101067777 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [X]CN101222710 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [XP]CN102662649 (HUIZHOU TCL MOBILE COMM CO LTD) |