EP2828741 - METHOD IN A PROCESSOR, AN APPARATUS AND A COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2015/05] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÄHTEENMÄKI, Mika Paavo Kolin katu 1 A 1 FI-33720 Tampere / FI | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 12871972.1 | 21.03.2012 | WO2012FI50285 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013140019 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2828741 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 26.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38, G06F9/50, G06F9/48, G06F15/16 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
G06F15/17337 (EP,US);
G06F9/3869 (US);
G06F15/80 (US);
G06F9/30174 (EP,US);
G06F9/3836 (EP,US);
G06F9/3867 (EP,US);
G06F9/3885 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN IN EINEM PROZESSOR, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2015/05] | English: | METHOD IN A PROCESSOR, AN APPARATUS AND A COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2015/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DANS UN PROCESSEUR, APPAREIL ET PRODUIT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR | [2015/05] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/25] | 02.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004059464 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-7,13-15* figure 7 *; | [X]US7461236 (WENTZLAFF DAVID [US]) [X] 1-7,13-15 * the whole document *; | [E]US8181168 (LEE WALTER [US], et al) [E] 1,14 * column 6, line 14 - column 8, line 17 * * page 10, line 32 - line 39 * | International search | [A]US2004244000 (FRANK STEVEN [US], et al); | [X]US7734895 (AGARWAL ANANT [US], et al); | [A] - CHANGKYU ET AL., "Composable lightweight processors", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 40TH ANNUAL IEEE/ACM INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MICROARCHITECTURE., (2007), pages 381 - 394, XP031194156 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MICRO.2007.41 |