EP2829625 - DEVICE FOR APPLYING A COATING TO AN EXTENDED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kulakovsky, Aleksandr Aleksandrovich Arkhangelsky pereulok 7/1-15 Moscow 101000 / RU | [2015/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2018/32] | Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2015/05] | Langenskiöld, Tord Karl Walter, et al Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso-Roobertinkatu 4-6 A 00120 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 12872035.6 | 23.03.2012 | [2018/32] | WO2012RU00206 | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013141739 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | RU | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2829625 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2829625 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 26.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C23C2/00, C23C2/38, C23C2/40 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
C23C2/40 (EP,US);
C23C2/36 (US);
B05C3/02 (US);
B05C3/09 (US);
B05C3/10 (US);
B05C3/12 (US);
B05C3/125 (US);
B05C3/132 (US);
C23C2/0036 (EP,US);
C23C2/00361 (EP,US);
C23C2/38 (EP,US);
C23C2/52 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/05] | C23C2/00, C23C2/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFTRAGEN EINER BESCHICHTUNG AUF EINEN LÄNGLICHEN ARTIKEL | [2015/05] | English: | DEVICE FOR APPLYING A COATING TO AN EXTENDED ARTICLE | [2015/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR APPLIQUER UN REVÊTEMENT SUR UN ARTICLE ALLONGÉ | [2018/21] |
Former [2015/05] | DISPOSITIF POUR APPLIQUER U REVÊTEMENT SUR UN ARTICLE ALLONGÉ | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2014 | Translation filed | 20.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 03.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2012 | AL | 08.08.2018 | CY | 08.08.2018 | EE | 08.08.2018 | FI | 08.08.2018 | HR | 08.08.2018 | LT | 08.08.2018 | LV | 08.08.2018 | MC | 08.08.2018 | MK | 08.08.2018 | PL | 08.08.2018 | RO | 08.08.2018 | RS | 08.08.2018 | SI | 08.08.2018 | SK | 08.08.2018 | SM | 08.08.2018 | TR | 08.08.2018 | BG | 08.11.2018 | GR | 09.11.2018 | IS | 08.12.2018 | PT | 08.12.2018 | IE | 23.03.2019 | MT | 23.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 23.03.2012 | |
AL | 08.08.2018 | ||
CY | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
IE | 23.03.2019 | ||
MT | 23.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CY | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
IE | 23.03.2019 | ||
MT | 23.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
IE | 23.03.2019 | ||
MT | 23.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
IE | 23.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
IE | 23.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 08.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3484280 (CARREKER ROLAND P JR) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 7; figure 1 *; | [XI]US3510345 (MARCHANT PETER R) [X] 1 * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 64; figure 1 * [I] 2-4; | [A]US3842896 (DOBO E) [A] 1-4 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 51 * * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 42 *; | [A]US2002007784 (SANCHEZ GERALD [FR], et al) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-4 * * page 4, paragraphs 64,65 ** page 5, paragraph 87 * | International search | [A]RU1492759 (SPETSIALNOE KONSTRUKTORSKOE BYURO MAGNITNOI GIDRODINAMIKI INSTITUTA FI); | [A]FR2323772 (DELOT JOSE [FR]); | [A]RU2093602 (MANNESMANN AG [DE], et al); | [A]RU2237743 (ZAKRYTOE AKTSIONERNOE OBSHCHESTVO «MEZHOTRASLEVOE IURIDICHESKOE AGENS); | [A]EP1611263 (SMS DEMAG AG [DE]) | by applicant | RU2127167 | GB2368596 | RU2339732 |