EP2843356 - TOOL MEASURING METHOD AND MACHINE TOOLS PROVIDED WITH MEASURING FUNCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Makino Milling Machine Co., Ltd. 3-19 Nakane 2-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8578 / JP | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIYAMA, Kousuke c/o MAKINO MILLING MACHINE CO., LTD. 4023 Nakatsu Aikawa-machi Aiko-gun, Kanagawa 243-0303 / JP | 02 /
KIMURA, Tadashi c/o MAKINO MILLING MACHINE CO., LTD. 4023 Nakatsu Aikawa-machi Aiko-gun, Kanagawa 243-0303 / JP | 03 /
NAKAMURA, Tadahiro c/o MAKINO MILLING MACHINE CO., LTD. 4023 Nakatsu Aikawa-machi Aiko-gun, Kanagawa 243-0303 / JP | [2016/33] |
Former [2015/10] | 01 /
SUGIYAMA, Kousuke c/o MAKINO MILLING MACHINE CO. LTD. 4023 Nakatsu Aikawa-machi Aiko-gun, Kanagawa 243-0303 / JP | ||
02 /
KIMURA, Tadashi c/o MAKINO MILLING MACHINE CO. LTD. 4023 Nakatsu Aikawa-machi Aiko-gun, Kanagawa 243-0303 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKAMURA, Tadahiro c/o MAKINO MILLING MACHINE CO. LTD. 4023 Nakatsu Aikawa-machi Aiko-gun, Kanagawa 243-0303 / JP | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/10] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12873567.7 | 06.04.2012 | [2016/33] | WO2012JP59573 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013150653 | Date: | 10.10.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2843356 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2843356 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01B5/008, B23Q17/00 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
B23Q17/0914 (EP,US);
B23H9/08 (EP,US);
G01B5/008 (EP,US);
G01B5/012 (US);
G01B5/02 (EP,US);
G01B5/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WERKZEUGMESSVERFAHREN UND WERKZEUGMASCHINEN MIT MESSFUNKTIONEN | [2015/10] | English: | TOOL MEASURING METHOD AND MACHINE TOOLS PROVIDED WITH MEASURING FUNCTIONS | [2015/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE D'OUTIL ET MACHINES-OUTILS DOTÉES DE FONCTIONS DE MESURE | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2014 | Translation filed | 24.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 10.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.04.2012 | AL | 17.08.2016 | AT | 17.08.2016 | BE | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | DK | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | ES | 17.08.2016 | FI | 17.08.2016 | HR | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | MK | 17.08.2016 | NL | 17.08.2016 | PL | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | RS | 17.08.2016 | SE | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | SM | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | NO | 17.11.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | IS | 17.12.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | IE | 06.04.2017 | LU | 06.04.2017 | MT | 06.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 06.04.2012 | |
AL | 17.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
IE | 06.04.2017 | ||
LU | 06.04.2017 | ||
MT | 06.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 06.04.2012 | |
AL | 17.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
IE | 06.04.2017 | ||
LU | 06.04.2017 | ||
MT | 06.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 06.04.2012 | |
AL | 17.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
IE | 06.04.2017 | ||
LU | 06.04.2017 | ||
MT | 06.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.04.2012 | |
AL | 17.08.2016 | ||
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
IE | 06.04.2017 | ||
LU | 06.04.2017 | ||
MT | 06.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 17.08.2016 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
IE | 06.04.2017 | ||
LU | 06.04.2017 | ||
MT | 06.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
IE | 06.04.2017 | ||
LU | 06.04.2017 | ||
MT | 06.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
LU | 06.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005335018 (TOYOTA IND CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]JPS59175944 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]JPH01306152 (SHARP KK; SHARP SEIKI KK) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]JP2004205241 (MITSUBISHI MAT KOBE TOOLS CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2005335018 (TOYOTA IND CORP); | [A]JP2007003205 (MITSUBISHI MAT KOBE TOOLS CORP); | [A]JPS59175944 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPH10277889 (OKUMA MACHINERY WORKS LTD) | by applicant | JP2006284446 |