EP2836961 - NON-CONTACT FINGERPRINTING SYSTEMS WTH AFOCAL OPTICAL SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2015/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMSKE, Steven J. 3404 E. Harmony Road Ft. Collins, Colorado 80528-9544 / US | 02 /
ADAMS, Guy Longdown Avenue&Stoke Gifford Bristol Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12874310.1 | 12.04.2012 | WO2012US33174 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013154557 | Date: | 17.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2836961 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G02B17/08 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
G02B17/08 (EP,US);
G06V40/1312 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/08] | G06K9/20, G06K9/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/08] | Title | German: | KONTAKTLOSE FINGERABDRUCKSYSTEME MIT AFOKALEN OPTISCHEN SYSTEMEN | [2015/08] | English: | NON-CONTACT FINGERPRINTING SYSTEMS WTH AFOCAL OPTICAL SYSTEMS | [2015/08] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE RELEVÉ D'EMPREINTES DIGITALES SANS CONTACT COMPRENANT DES SYSTÈMES OPTIQUES AFOCAUX | [2015/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2014 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 22.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/12] | 28.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010134916 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [A] 1,3-5,8,12,13 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP1643415 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,3-5,8,12,13 * paragraph [0014] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0027] - [0064] * * paragraphs [0074] - [0077] * * figures 1,13 *; | [XY] - GUY ADAMS, "Hand held Dyson Relay Lens for anti-counterfeiting", IMAGING SYSTEMS AND TECHNIQUES (IST), 2010 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (201007), ISBN 978-1-4244-6492-0, pages 273 - 278, XP031732631 [X] 1,3-5 * the whole document * [Y] 1,2,6-15 | [Y] - E J BUSSELAAR, "Improved pores detection in fingerprints by applying ring led's (525 nm)", OPTICA APPLICATA, (2010), vol. 40, no. 4, pages 843 - 861, XP055249122 [Y] 1,2,6-15 * pages 843-848 * | [A] - William B Wetherell, "Afocal Systems", Handbook of Optics, Volume II, Devices, Measurements, and Properties, New York, NY, McGraw-Hill, (1995), pages 2.1 - 2.23, 021278, ISBN 978-0-07-047974-6, XP055248971 [A] 1,3-5,8,12,13 * figure 23A * | [A] - KALLO P ET AL, "Applications of afocal optical systems in metrology, instrumentation techniques and information technology", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 1ST CONFERENCE ON MECHANICAL ENGINEERING, GEPESZET'98 ; 19980528 TO 19980529; BUDAPEST, HUNGARY, SPRINGER HUNGARICA KIADÓ, HU, (19980528), vol. 2, ISBN 978-963-699-078-7, pages 835 - 842, XP008178966 [A] 1,3,8,13 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2006072796 (SANO EMIKO [JP], et al); | [A]US6643390 (CLARK PETER P [US], et al); | [A]US2001026632 (TAMAI SEIICHIRO [JP]); | [A]US2004041998 (HADDAD WALEED S [US]); | [A]US5956176 (HARDER JAMES A [US], et al) |