EP2851101 - NEEDLE BASE RETRACTABLE-TYPE SAFE SELF-LOCKING-TYPE SELF-DESTRUCTING SYRINGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhang, Linfeng Room 604 No.2 Building Rongzu Group Yongzhong Street, Longwan District Wenzhou, Zhejiang 325024 / CN | [2015/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | Inal, Aysegul Seda, et al Yalciner Patent and Consulting Ltd. Tunus Cad. 85/4 06680 Kavaklidere, Ankara / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | Gualeni, Nadia Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | Application number, filing date | 12875147.6 | 28.05.2012 | WO2012CN00739 | Priority number, date | CN201210127996 | 27.04.2012 Original published format: CN201210127996 | [2015/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013159254 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2851101 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32, A61M5/50 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
A61M5/322 (EP,US);
A61M5/3221 (US);
A61M5/3234 (US);
A61M5/50 (US);
A61M2005/31508 (EP,US);
A61M2005/323 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/13] | Title | German: | SELBSTSICHERNDE UND SELBSTZERSTÖRENDE SPRITZE MIT EINZIEHBARER NADEL | [2015/13] | English: | NEEDLE BASE RETRACTABLE-TYPE SAFE SELF-LOCKING-TYPE SELF-DESTRUCTING SYRINGE | [2015/13] | French: | SERINGUE NON RÉUTILISABLE DU TYPE À BASE D'AIGUILLE RÉTRACTABLE ET À AUTO-VERROUILLAGE DE SÉCURITÉ | [2015/13] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2015 | Translation filed | 15.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/13] | 15.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 28.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/12] | 12.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2018 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 15.01.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.02.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees PT, CY, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 15.01.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.02.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 15.01.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.02.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 15.01.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.02.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 15.01.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.02.2015 | Decision despatched | 15.01.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.02.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 27.11.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.01.2015 | 31.05.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2006079257 (LIN ZUOQIAN [CN]) [X] 1,4,9 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-19 * [Y] 9 [I] 6; | [XYI]CN2803412Y (LIN ZUOQIAN [CN]) [X] 1,4 * the whole document * [Y] 9 [I] 6; | [YA]CN200987815Y (ZEMU LIU [CN]) [Y] 9 * figures 1-4 *[A] 1,3-8; | [A]US2010286610 (CHANG SHU-MING [TW]) [A] 1,3-9 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1-20 *; | [XI]EP2279771 (SOL MILLENNIUM MEDICAL PRODUCTS CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019]; figures 1-15 * [I] 6; | [XYI]US8034025 (CHANG SHU-MING [TW]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8 * column 3, line 10 - column 5, line 43; figures 1-14 * [Y] 9 [I] 6; | [XYI]CN102327658 (BAODONG BAI) [X] 1,3-5,7,8 * the whole document * [Y] 9 [I] 6 | International search | [A]CN1803212 (LIN ZUOQIAN [CN]); | [X]CN2803412Y (LIN ZUOQIAN [CN]); | [X]CN200980870Y (ZUOQIAN LIN [CN]); | [Y]CN200987815Y (ZEMU LIU [CN]); | [Y]CN101474443 (LINGGANG ZHOU [CN]); | [A]CN102284113 (KUNSHAN HEXING MEDICAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.) | by applicant | CN1803212 | CN101474443 |