EP2841194 - AMMONIA GAS GENERATION FROM UREA FOR LOW TEMPERATURE PROCESS REQUIREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.09.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuel Tech, Inc. 27601 Bella Vista Parkway Warrenville, IL 60555 / US | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, William, H. 2285 Pebble Creek Drive Lisle, IL 60532 / US | 02 /
BOYLE, John, M. 1047 N. Lombard Avenue Oak Park, IL 60302 / US | 03 /
CARMIGNANI, Paul, G. 908 Brocks End Court Naperville, IL 60540 / US | 04 /
MAYHEW, Scott, M. 507 Dogwood Court North Aurora, IL 60542-1004 / US | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12875513.9 | 26.04.2012 | WO2012US35237 | Priority number, date | US201213455459 | 25.04.2012 Original published format: US201213455459 | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013162580 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2841194 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00, F01N3/20, C01C1/08 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
C01C1/086 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J19/0013 (EP,CN,US);
B01J19/245 (EP,CN,US);
B01J19/2485 (EP,CN,US);
B01J7/02 (KR);
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00006 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/00051 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/00164 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/00166 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/002 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/00231 (EP,CN,US);
C01B2210/0075 (US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US);
F01N2610/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/10] | B01J19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Title | German: | AMMONIAKGASERZEUGUNG AUS HARNSTOFF ZUR NIEDERTEMPERATURPROZESSANFORDERUNGEN | [2015/10] | English: | AMMONIA GAS GENERATION FROM UREA FOR LOW TEMPERATURE PROCESS REQUIREMENTS | [2015/10] | French: | GÉNÉRATION DE GAZ AMMONIAC À PARTIR D'URÉE POUR DES EXIGENCES DE PROCÉDÉ À BASSE TEMPÉRATURE | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 19.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.11.2018 | 28.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/07] | 08.10.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/07] | 08.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009151339 (DORING ANDREAS [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0014] - [0021] - [0040] , [0041] , [0052] , [0056] - [0058]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2005207961 (BROOKS BURTON [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0011] , [0016] , [0102] - [0104] - [0110] , [0112] , [0115]; figures 9,10 *; | [Y]EP0487886 (MAN TECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 55; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2004040288 (JACOB EBERHARD [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3 * paragraph [0058]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]US2009324453 (HARINATH ARVIND V [US], et al); | [Y]US6314722 (MATROS YURII SH [US], et al); | [Y]US2004126294 (COOPER HAL B H [US], et al) |