EP2848227 - METHOD FOR THE RENEWAL OF BIOLOGICAL TISSUES AND DEVICE FOR THE IMPLEMENTATION THEREOF (EMBODIMENTS) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Khomchanka, Uladzimir Valiantinavich 39-19 Uliyanonskaya st Minsk 220006 / BY | For all designated states Gorbach, Dmitry Vladislavovich 58/1-348 Bajkalskaja st Minsk 220102 / BY | For all designated states Sukhadolau, Aliaksandr Valerjavich 59/1-70 Gazeta «Zviazda» av. Minsk 220117 / BY | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Jeck, Anton Jeck, Fleck & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | Jeck, Anton Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 12876284.6 | 06.09.2012 | WO2012BY00002 | Priority number, date | EA20120000845 | 11.05.2012 Original published format: EA 201200845 | [2015/12] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013166577 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | RU | [2013/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2848227 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 14.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/20, A61N7/00, A61H23/00 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
A61B18/203 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61N7/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61H23/0245 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61N5/0616 (KR);
A61N5/067 (KR);
A61B2018/00452 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B2018/0047 (EP,CN,US);
A61H2201/10 (EP,CN,US);
A61N2007/0034 (EP,CN,US);
A61N2007/0078 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ERNEUERN VON BIOLOGISCHEN GEWEBEN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS (VARIANTEN) | [2015/12] | English: | METHOD FOR THE RENEWAL OF BIOLOGICAL TISSUES AND DEVICE FOR THE IMPLEMENTATION THEREOF (EMBODIMENTS) | [2015/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RENOUVELLEMENT DE TISSUS BIOLOGIQUES ET DISPOSITIF POUR METTRE EN UVRE CE PROCÉDÉ (ET VARIANTES) | [2015/12] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2014 | Translation filed | 11.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 17.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/15] | 06.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP18158021.8 / EP3366253 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5725482 (BISHOP RICHARD P [US]) [X] 8,9 * column 3, lines 13-54 * * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 6 * * figure 4 *; | [X]US6595934 (HISSONG JAMES B [US], et al) [X] 8,9 * column 4, line 46 - column 6, line 34 * * column 13, lines 57-63 ** figures 3, 4 *; | [X]WO2012018391 (GUIDED THERAPY SYSTEMS LLC [US], et al) [X] 8,9 * paragraphs [0004] - [0008] - [0 39] - [0044] - [0 70] - [0080] - [0 98] , [0 99] * * figures 2, 3 * | International search | [X]US2005085748 (CULP WILLIAM C [US], et al); | [Y]US2007179570 (DE TABOADA LUIS [US], et al); | [A]WO2008073994 (ACOUSTX CORP [US], et al); | [Y]US2012095533 (WANG SEAN XIAOLU [US]) | by applicant | US6997923 | US2011218464 | US2012016239 | US2012053458 | - B. YEREMEYEV; K. KALAYDZYAN, "Laser gegen Falten. Elektronischer Almanach", KOSMETIK UND MEDIZIN, (20120406), URL: http://daniel.ru/cm/arc/r403.htm. |